Harrison v. Wells Fargo Bank
Plaintiff: George O. Harrison, Jr.
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Case Number: 3:2019cv00733
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: M Hannah Lauck
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SO ORDERED re: Plaintiff's #3 Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 10/28/2019. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (walk, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Dismissal by George O. Harrison, Jr. (sbea, )
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that on October 7, 2019, pro se Plaintiff George O. Harrison, Jr., filed an "Application to Proceed in this District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Short Form)" with his Complaint attached. (ECF No. #1 .) Harrison did not use the in forma pauperis form that the Court requires. Therefore, the Court ORDERS Harrison to file with the Court the correct Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (a copy of which is enclosed) no later than November 8, 2019. Harrison did not submit the Ghostwriting Form in accordance with Local Rule 83.1(M), which the Court requires to be filed with his submission, stating that he did not receive assistance in preparing his Complaint. Therefore, the Court ORDERS Harrison to file with the Court the Ghostwriting Form (a copy of which is enclosed) no later than November 8, 2019.The failure to strictly comply with the Court's directives and with applicable rules will result in DISMISSAL OF THIS ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). It is SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 10/09/2019. Copy of Order and required forms mailed to Plaintiff. (walk, )
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by George O. Harrison, Jr. (Attachment: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Letter). (sbea, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrison v. Wells Fargo Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George O. Harrison, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?