Sandifer v. Saul
Plaintiff: Casina Sandifer
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Case Number: 3:2019cv00736
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: M Hannah Lauck
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER IN A SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. See Order for Details. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 12/06/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice, Consent, and Order of Reference) (smej, )
December 5, 2019 Sealed Administrative Record placed on shelf in Clerk's Office. (tjoh, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by SSA (Social Security Administration), Andrew M. Saul.(Lucier, Jonathan)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed David B. Goetz for Casina Sandifer. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 11/14/2019. (tjoh, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by David B. Goetz and Certification of Local Counsel Bruce K. Billman Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6930448. by Casina Sandifer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Attorney Good Standing - State of Florida)(Billman, Bruce) (Main Document 8 replaced on 11/14/2019) (tjoh, ).
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Casina Sandifer. SSA (Social Security Administration) served on 10/16/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Mail Return Receipt Requested executed by Commissioner of SSA, U.S. Attorney General and U.S. Attorney for E.D. Va.)(Billman, Bruce)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Novak on 07/20/2018. (tjoh, )
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REVISED STANDING ORDER IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Novak on 10/17/2013. (tjoh, )
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate Reporting Service by Andrew M. Saul. Andrew M. Saul served on 10/10/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (tjoh, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Remove header and print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (tjoh, )
October 9, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (tjoh, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Casina Sandifer. (Billman, Bruce)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6877914.), filed by Casina Sandifer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Billman, Bruce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandifer v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casina Sandifer
Represented By: Bruce Knight Billman
Represented By: David B. Goetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Jonathan Tyler Lucier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Represented By: Jonathan Tyler Lucier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?