Vlaming v. West Point School Board et al
Plaintiff: Peter Vlaming
Defendant: Suzanne Aunspach, Jonathan Hochman, Laura Abel and West Point School Board
Petitioner: John Doe
Case Number: 3:2019cv00773
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John A Gibney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION for Leave to File an Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Peter Vlaming. (Dalton, Jonathan)
December 16, 2019 Filing 32 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Intervene filed by John Doe. (Quinn, Colleen)
December 16, 2019 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Pseudonymously filed by John Doe. (Quinn, Colleen)
December 11, 2019 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand filed by Peter Vlaming. (Dalton, Jonathan)
December 9, 2019 Filing 29 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Pseudonymously filed by Peter Vlaming. (Dalton, Jonathan)
December 9, 2019 Filing 28 Memorandum in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Intervene filed by Peter Vlaming. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dalton, Jonathan)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING #21 Motion by West Point School Board for the Admission of Tania Faransso, Esquire Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 12/09/2019. (walk, )
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING #20 Motion by West Point School Board for the Admission of Bruce Berman, Esquire Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 12/09/2019. (walk, )
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING #19 Motion by West Point School Board for the Admission of Paul Wolfson, Esquire Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 12/09/2019. (walk, )
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #18 Motion by West Point School Board for the Admission of Alan Schoenfeld, Esquire Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 12/09/2019. (walk, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 23 Memorandum in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand filed by Laura Abel, Suzanne Aunspach, Jonathan Hochman, West Point School Board. (Haney, Stacy)
December 5, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to File an Opposition to Plaintiff's #5 Motion to Remand by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand). (Quinn, Colleen)
December 5, 2019 Filing 21 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Tania Faransso and Certification of Local Counsel Stacy L. Haney Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6971603. by Laura Abel, Suzanne Aunspach, Jonathan Hochman, West Point School Board. (Haney, Stacy)
December 5, 2019 Filing 20 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Bruce Berman and Certification of Local Counsel Stacy L. Haney Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6971602. by Laura Abel, Suzanne Aunspach, Jonathan Hochman, West Point School Board. (Haney, Stacy)
December 5, 2019 Filing 19 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul Wolfson and Certification of Local Counsel Stacy L. Haney Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6971600. by Laura Abel, Suzanne Aunspach, Jonathan Hochman, West Point School Board. (Haney, Stacy)
December 5, 2019 Filing 18 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Alan Schoenfeld and Certification of Local Counsel Stacy L. Haney Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6971598. by Laura Abel, Suzanne Aunspach, Jonathan Hochman, West Point School Board. (Haney, Stacy)
December 3, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #15 MOTION to Stay Proceedings on Motions to Intervene #7 and to Proceed Pseudonymously #9 with Memorandum in Support filed by Peter Vlaming. (Dalton, Jonathan) Modified on 12/4/2019 (jsau, ).
November 27, 2019 Filing 16 Memorandum in Opposition re: #15 MOTION to Stay Proceedings on Motions to Intervene #7 and to Proceed Pseudonymously #9 with Memorandum in Support, filed by John Doe. (Quinn, Colleen) Modified docket text on 12/4/2019 (jsau, ).
November 26, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Stay with Memorandum in Support re: #7 MOTION to Intervene, #9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Pseudonymously and Memorandum in Support by Peter Vlaming (Dalton, Jonathan). Modified docket text on 11/26/2019 (sbea, ).
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Luke Platzer to appear as Pro Hac Vice for John Doe. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 11/25/2019. (sbea, )
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Asaf Orr to appear as Pro Hac Vice for John Doe. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 11/25/2019. (sbea, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 12 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Luke Platzer and Certification of Local Counsel Colleen M. Quinn Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6955646. by John Doe. (Quinn, Colleen)
November 25, 2019 Filing 11 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Asaf Orr and Certification of Local Counsel Colleen M. Quinn Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6955640. by John Doe. (Quinn, Colleen)
November 25, 2019 Filing 10 Memorandum in Support re #9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Pseudonymously filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Doe in Support)(Quinn, Colleen)
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Pseudonymously by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Quinn, Colleen)
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 Memorandum in Support re #7 MOTION to Intervene filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Doe in Support)(Quinn, Colleen)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Intervene by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Intervenor John Doe's [Conditional] Answer, #2 Proposed Order)(Quinn, Colleen)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION to Remand filed by Peter Vlaming. (Dalton, Jonathan)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand by Peter Vlaming. (Dalton, Jonathan)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 DISREGARD - See docket entry #5 MOTION to Remand by Peter Vlaming. (Attachment: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand)(Dalton, Jonathan). Clerk modified docket text on 11/21/2019 (sbea, ).
November 21, 2019 Notice of Correction re: #4 MOTION to Remand; Clerk notified filing attorney of correct filing procedures for submitting the "Memorandum in Support". Attorney was requested to re-file the document and link it back to the motion. (sbea, )
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CONSENT ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND SCHEDULING ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR REMAND re: #2 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (please see Consent Order for additional information.) IT IS HEREBY FURTHER STIPULATED by and among counsel for both parties that the following schedule shall apply to Plaintiff's anticipated Motion for Remand: Plaintiff's Motion for Remand is due to be filed no later than November 21, 2019; West Point Defendants' Opposition is due to be filed on or before fourteen days after the filing of Plaintiff's Motion for Remand or December 5, 2019, whichever is earlier; and, Plaintiff's Reply is due to be filed on or before six days after the West Point Defendants' Opposition is filed or December 11, 2019, whichever is earlier. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 10/29/2019. (walk, )
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Laura Abel, Suzanne Aunspach, Jonathan Hochman, West Point School Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Haney, Stacy)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal filed by West Point School Board, Suzanne Aunspach, Jonathan Hochman and Laura Abel. Case removed from the King William County Circuit Court, Case No. CL 19-454. (Filing Fee Paid: $400.00, Receipt Number: 0422-6899965). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet and #2 Exhibit). (Haney, Stacy). Modified docket entry on 10/22/2019 and regenerated NEF. (walk, ).
October 22, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. (walk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vlaming v. West Point School Board et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Vlaming
Represented By: Jonathan Caleb Dalton
Represented By: Shawn Ashley Voyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Aunspach
Represented By: Stacy Leann Haney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Hochman
Represented By: Stacy Leann Haney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Abel
Represented By: Stacy Leann Haney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Point School Board
Represented By: Stacy Leann Haney
Represented By: Alan Schoenfeld
Represented By: Bruce Berman
Represented By: Tania Faransso
Represented By: Paul Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Doe
Represented By: Colleen Marea Quinn
Represented By: Asaf Orr
Represented By: Luke Platzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?