Garrett v. Clarke et al
Plaintiff: Jacoby L Garrett
Defendant: Harold W. Clarke, Richard A Davis, Stretcher V. Felicia, Department of Corrections, Commonwealth of Virginia and Felicia V. Stretcher
Case Number: 3:2019cv00835
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert E Payne
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jacoby L Garrett. Harold W. Clarke waiver sent on 11/26/2019, answer due 1/25/2020; Richard A Davis waiver sent on 11/26/2019, answer due 1/25/2020; Department of Corrections, Commonwealth of Virginia waiver sent on 11/26/2019, answer due 1/25/2020; Stretcher V. Felicia waiver sent on 11/26/2019, answer due 1/25/2020. (Allen, Robert)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to All Defendants on 11/12/2019 by Jacoby L Garrett. Waiver of Service due by 12/12/2019. (Allen, Robert)
November 12, 2019 Notice of Correction: Filing attorney has been instructed to file proposed summons to serve defendants, or if waiving service, to notify the court in writing by electronically filing the notice. (smej, )
November 8, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Robert E. Payne. (tjoh, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6931410.), filed by Jacoby L Garrett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Letter, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A - DHRM Policy 1.05, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B - OP 130.2 receipt, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C - OP 135.4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D - OP 135.1, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E - Hearing officer decision, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F - Letter opinion and order, #9 Exhibit Exhibit G - Court of Appeals order)(Allen, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrett v. Clarke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacoby L Garrett
Represented By: Robert Jackson Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold W. Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stretcher V. Felicia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections, Commonwealth of Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felicia V. Stretcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?