Duran Euceda v. Barr, et al
Defendant: Acting Secretary Chad F. Wolf, ICE Director Matthew T. Albence, Warden, Farmville Jeffrey Crawford, Field Office Dir. Russell Hott and US Attorney General William P. Barr
Petitioner: Kevin Daniel Duran Euceda
Case Number: 3:2019cv00867
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert E Payne
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER - The hearing scheduled for January 21, 2020 is CANCELLED. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file any supplemental briefing regarding whether the MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (ECF No. 10) is moot. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 01/16/2020. (tjoh, )
January 15, 2020 Filing 17 Response to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241),,, filed by Matthew T. Albence, William P. Barr, Jeffrey Crawford, Russell Hott, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hambrick, Jonathan)
January 15, 2020 Filing 16 Memorandum in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Matthew T. Albence, William P. Barr, Jeffrey Crawford, Russell Hott, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Hambrick, Jonathan)
January 15, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Matthew T. Albence, William P. Barr, Jeffrey Crawford, Russell Hott, Chad F. Wolf. (Hambrick, Jonathan)
January 15, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, William P. Barr, Jeffrey Crawford, Russell Hott, Chad F. Wolf re #10 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit BIA Order)(Hambrick, Jonathan)
December 23, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Kevin Daniel Duran Euceda. (Shapiro, Jonathan)
December 18, 2019 Filing 12 Opposition to #10 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Matthew T. Albence, William P. Barr, Jeffrey Crawford, Russell Hott, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hambrick, Jonathan)
December 11, 2019 Filing 11 Memorandum in Support re #10 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Kevin Daniel Duran Euceda. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit Ex. A, #3 Exhibit Ex. B, #4 Exhibit Ex. C, #5 Exhibit Ex. D, #6 Exhibit Ex. E, #7 Exhibit Ex. F, #8 Exhibit Ex. G, #9 Exhibit Ex. H, #10 Exhibit Ex. I, #11 Exhibit Ex. J, #12 Exhibit Ex. K, #13 Exhibit Ex. L, #14 Exhibit Ex. M (1 of 3), #15 Exhibit Ex. M (2 of 3), #16 Exhibit Ex. M (3 of 3), #17 Exhibit Ex. N, #18 Exhibit Ex. O, #19 Exhibit Ex. P, #20 Exhibit Ex. Q, #21 Exhibit Ex. R)(Shapiro, Jonathan)
December 11, 2019 Filing 10 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Kevin Daniel Duran Euceda. (Shapiro, Jonathan)
December 9, 2019 Notice of Correction; notified filing attorney of proper procedures for filing Memorandum in Support of Motion including the proper nine-element signature block. The filing attorney is instructed to refile the Memorandum in Support of the Motion for Preliminary Injunction #8 with the appropriate attached exhibits. (jtho, )
December 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Holland Hambrick on behalf of Matthew T. Albence, William P. Barr, Jeffrey Crawford, Russell Hott, Chad F. Wolf (Hambrick, Jonathan)
December 4, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Kevin Daniel Duran Euceda. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit Ex. A1, #4 Exhibit Ex. A2, #5 Exhibit Ex. B, #6 Exhibit Ex. C, #7 Exhibit Ex. D1, #8 Exhibit Ex. D2, #9 Exhibit Ex. D3, #10 Exhibit Ex. D4, #11 Exhibit Ex. E, #12 Exhibit Ex. F, #13 Exhibit Ex. G1, #14 Exhibit Ex. G2, #15 Exhibit Ex. H, #16 Exhibit Ex. I, #17 Exhibit Ex. J, #18 Exhibit Ex. K, #19 Exhibit Ex. L, #20 Exhibit Ex. M, #21 Exhibit Ex. N, #22 Exhibit Ex. O, #23 Exhibit Ex. P, #24 Exhibit Ex. Q1, #25 Exhibit Ex. Q2, #26 Exhibit Ex. Q3, #27 Exhibit Ex. R)(Shapiro, Jonathan)
November 27, 2019 Set Hearing: Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 1/21/2020 at 10:00 AM in Richmond Courtroom 7400 before District Judge Robert E. Payne. (nbrow)
November 26, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Robert E. Payne: Telephone Conference held on 11/26/2019. (Court Reporter Peppy Peterson, OCR.) (nbrow)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying without prejudice #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiff is given leave to file a new motion for preliminary injunction. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. A hearing on the preliminary injunction, if necessary, will be held on January 21, 2020 at 10 AM.Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 11/26/2019. (tjoh, )
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM ORDER - It is ORDERED that: The Petition (ECF No. 1) shall be FILED; and the United States Attorney's Office, upon agreement, will accept service of the Petition on behalf of all Respondents; and Respondents shall file, by January 15, 2020, their Response and any other motion with respect to the Petition (ECF No. 1). Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 11/26/2019. (tjoh, )
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Matthew Sinclair Boaz for Kevin Daniel Duran Euceda. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 11/25/2019. (tjoh, )
November 22, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Robert E. Payne. (tjoh, )
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet by Kevin Daniel DURAN EUCEDA. (Shapiro, Jonathan)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Kevin Daniel DURAN EUCEDA. (Shapiro, Jonathan) (Main Document 3 replaced on 11/22/2019) (tjoh, ).
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew Boaz and Certification of Local Counsel Jonathan Shapiro Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6953026. by Kevin Daniel DURAN EUCEDA. (Shapiro, Jonathan)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0422-6952947.), filed by Kevin Daniel DURAN EUCEDA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit Ex. A, #3 Exhibit Ex. B, #4 Exhibit Ex. C1, #5 Exhibit Ex. C2, #6 Exhibit Ex. C3, #7 Exhibit Ex. C4, #8 Exhibit Ex. C5, #9 Exhibit Ex. C6, #10 Exhibit Ex. C7, #11 Exhibit Ex. C8, #12 Exhibit Ex. C9, #13 Exhibit Ex. C10, #14 Exhibit Ex. D, #15 Exhibit Ex. E, #16 Exhibit Ex. F1, #17 Exhibit Ex. F2, #18 Exhibit Ex. G, #19 Exhibit Ex. H, #20 Exhibit Ex. I, #21 Exhibit Ex. J, #22 Exhibit Ex. K, #23 Exhibit Ex. L, #24 Exhibit Ex. M, #25 Exhibit Ex. N, #26 Exhibit Ex. O, #27 Exhibit Ex. P, #28 Exhibit Ex. Q1, #29 Exhibit Ex. Q2, #30 Exhibit Ex. Q3, #31 Exhibit Ex. R, #32 Exhibit Ex. S, #33 Exhibit Ex. T, #34 Exhibit Ex. U)(Shapiro, Jonathan) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/22/2019) (tjoh, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duran Euceda v. Barr, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary Chad F. Wolf
Represented By: Jonathan Holland Hambrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICE Director Matthew T. Albence
Represented By: Jonathan Holland Hambrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden, Farmville Jeffrey Crawford
Represented By: Jonathan Holland Hambrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Field Office Dir. Russell Hott
Represented By: Jonathan Holland Hambrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Attorney General William P. Barr
Represented By: Jonathan Holland Hambrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kevin Daniel Duran Euceda
Represented By: Jonathan Shapiro
Represented By: Matthew Sinclair Boaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?