Sprenkle v. Golden Rule Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Mark David Sprenkle
Defendant: Golden Rule Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00880
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Settlement Conference set for 4/29/2020 at 9:30 AM in Richmond Judges Chamber before Magistrate Judge Roderick C. Young. (mful)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REGARDING PROCEDURES FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - The Court has scheduled this case for a settlement conference on April 29, 2020 at 9:30 A.M. At that time, the parties shall report to the chambers of Magistrate Judge Roderick C. Young. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roderick C. Young on 1/10/2020. (smej, )
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL PRETRIAL ORDER - Jury Trial set for 6/22/2020 at 9:30 AM in Richmond Courtroom 7000 before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 1/9/2020) (rpiz)
January 9, 2020 Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Roderick C. Young for settlement purposes. (smej, )
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER (Settlement Conference Referral) - It is hereby ORDERED that the settlement conference and proceedings required by section I(E)(1) of Pretrial Schedule A are referred to United States Magistrate Judge Roderick C. Young. Counsel shall be responsible for contacting the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Young within five (5) days of the date of this Order to schedule the conference. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 1/9/2020. (smej, )
January 9, 2020 Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/9/2020 before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (rpiz)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Lance Clack to appear as Pro hac vice for Golden Rule Insurance Company. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 12/11/2019. (smej, )
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Andrew George Jubinsky to appear as Pro hac vice for Golden Rule Insurance Company. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 12/11/2019. (smej, )
December 10, 2019 Notice of Correction re #6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew G. Jubinsky and Certification of Local Counsel Neil S. Talegaonkar Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6975306. , #7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Lance V. Clack and Certification of Local Counsel Neil S. Talegaonkar Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6975467. : Clerk has notified filing attorney of proper filing procedures for pro hac vice motions. The clerk has corrected the docket entries. No further action is required. (smej, )
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Lance V. Clack and Certification of Local Counsel Neil S. Talegaonkar Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6975467. by Golden Rule Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Talegaonkar, Neil) (Main Document 7 replaced on 12/10/2019) (smej, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/10/2019) (smej, ). Modified on 12/10/2019 (smej, ).
December 9, 2019 Filing 6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew G. Jubinsky and Certification of Local Counsel Neil S. Talegaonkar Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6975306. by Golden Rule Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Talegaonkar, Neil) (Main Document 6 replaced on 12/10/2019) (smej, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/10/2019) (smej, ). Modified on 12/10/2019 (smej, ).
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER with Attachment #1 Pretrial Schedule A - Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/9/2020 at 9:10 AM before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (rpiz)
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Golden Rule Insurance Company. (Talegaonkar, Neil)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 Letter from the Clerk sent to plaintiff's attorney, Robert Keith Caudle, in regards to obtaining CM/ECF credentials. (smej, )
December 2, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (smej, )
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Golden Rule Insurance Company. (Talegaonkar, Neil)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal (Filing Fee: $400, Receipt Number: 0422-6959539), filed by Golden Rule Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B - Part 1, #3 Exhibit B - Part 2, #4 Exhibit B - Part 3, #5 Exhibit B - Part 4, #6 Exhibit B - Part 5, #7 Exhibit B - Part 6, #8 Exhibit B - Part 7, #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (Talegaonkar, Neil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sprenkle v. Golden Rule Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark David Sprenkle
Represented By: Robert Keith Caudle
Represented By: Robert Keith Caudle, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Rule Insurance Company
Represented By: Neil Shantaram Talegaonkar
Represented By: Lance Clack
Represented By: Andrew George Jubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?