Nunes v. Cable News Network, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff Devin G. Nunes alleged that Defendant Cable News Network, Inc. (CNN) published a defamatory report that (1) he was in Vienna last year; (2) he met with Victor Shokin to discuss digging up dirt on Joe Biden, and (3) he began communicating with Lev Parnas around the time of the Vienna trip.

Plaintiff: Devin G. Nunes
Defendant: Cable News Network, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00889
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert E Payne
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Kevin T. Baine to appear Pro hac vice for Cable News Network, Inc. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 1/22/20. (jsau, )
January 21, 2020 Filing 16 Memorandum in Support re #14 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Butswinkas, Dane)
January 21, 2020 Filing 15 Memorandum in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Butswinkas, Dane)
January 21, 2020 Notice of Correction re: #14 MOTION to Transfer Case, #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Filing attorney notified of correct procedures when filing a Motion and Memorandum in Support. Attorney directed to re-file the Memorandum for each motion and link each document back to the correct Motion. (jsau, )
January 17, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Transfer Case by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Proposed Order)(Butswinkas, Dane)
January 17, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order)(Butswinkas, Dane)
January 17, 2020 Filing 12 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin T. Baine and Certification of Local Counsel Emily Rose Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7031158. by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Butswinkas, Dane)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Stephen Fuzesi to appear Pro hac vice for Cable News Network, Inc. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 12/30/19. (jsau, )
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the CONSENT MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND #9 is granted with modification. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file its Answer and any other motions with respect to the Complaint by January 17, 2020. It is SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 12/20/19. (jsau, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Cable News Network, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Butswinkas, Dane) Modified docket text on 12/19/2019 (jsau, ).
December 18, 2019 Filing 8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephen J. Fuzesi and Certification of Local Counsel Emily Rose Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6992082. by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Butswinkas, Dane)
December 18, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Butswinkas, Dane)
December 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Dane Hal Butswinkas on behalf of Cable News Network, Inc. (Butswinkas, Dane)
December 5, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Devin G. Nunes Cable News Network, Inc. served on 12/5/2019, answer due 12/26/2019 (Biss, Steven)
December 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Cable News Network, Inc.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Remove header and print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (tjoh, )
December 3, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Robert E. Payne. (tjoh, )
December 3, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Devin G. Nunes. (Biss, Steven)
December 3, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Devin G. Nunes. (Biss, Steven)
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6966149.), filed by Devin G. Nunes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Biss, Steven) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/3/2019) (tjoh, ).
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6966149.), filed by Devin G. Nunes. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Biss, Steven) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/3/2019) (tjoh, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nunes v. Cable News Network, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devin G. Nunes
Represented By: Steven Scott Biss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cable News Network, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Fuzesi
Represented By: Kevin T. Baine
Represented By: Dane Hal Butswinkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?