HDI Global Specialty SE v. Short Pump Airsports, LLC et al
Plaintiff: HDI Global Specialty SE
Defendant: Short Pump Airsports, LLC and Basma Hassan
Case Number: 3:2019cv00891
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: M Hannah Lauck
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Basma Hassan.(Kohl, Mark)
January 6, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HDI Global Specialty SE Short Pump Airsports, LLC served on 12/23/2019, answer due 1/13/2020 (Garrett, Thomas)
December 31, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HDI Global Specialty SE Basma Hassan served on 12/26/2019, answer due 1/16/2020 (Garrett, Thomas)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Pro hac vice. Jesus Giovanny Avendano appointed for HDI Global Specialty SE. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 12/30/2019. (jsmi, )
December 20, 2019 Filing 8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jesus Giovanny Avendano and Certification of Local Counsel Thomas S. Garrett Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6995967. by HDI Global Specialty SE. (Garrett, Thomas)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Pro hac vice. Adam Rien Bunge for HDI Global Specialty SE. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 12/9/2019. (jsmi, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Adam Rien Bunge and Certification of Local Counsel Thomas S. Garrett Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6971299. by HDI Global Specialty SE. (Garrett, Thomas)
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Short Pump Airsports, LLC, and Basma Hassan. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (jsmi, )
December 4, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (jsmi, )
December 3, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by HDI Global Specialty SE. (Garrett, Thomas)
December 3, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by HDI Global Specialty SE. (Garrett, Thomas)
December 3, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HDI Global Specialty SE. (Garrett, Thomas) (Main Document 2 replaced on 12/4/2019) (jsmi, ).
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6966781.), filed by HDI Global Specialty SE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Garrett, Thomas) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/4/2019) (jsmi, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HDI Global Specialty SE v. Short Pump Airsports, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Short Pump Airsports, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Basma Hassan
Represented By: Mark Andrew Kohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HDI Global Specialty SE
Represented By: Thomas Simpson Garrett
Represented By: Adam Rien Bunge
Represented By: Jesus Giovanny Avendano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?