Jones v. Seiling et al
Plaintiff: W. David Jones
Defendant: Natalie C. Seiling, John T. Wait and United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00894
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM ORDER (Granting Government's Motion of Substitution). THIS MATTER is before the Court on the United States Government's ("Government") Motion of Substitution as Proper Party Defendant (the "Motion"), filed on December 4, 2019 #2 . For the reasons stated herein, the Government will be fully substituted for Defendant Wait, and will be partially substituted for Defendant Seiling, as a party Defendant. Further, there is currently pending an unopposed Motion to Dismiss, filed by the Government on December 6, 2019 #3 . At the hearing, Plaintiff requested fourteen (14) days from the hearing to respond to the Motion to Dismiss. Accordingly, Plaintiff has until February 5, 2020, to file his response, and the Government has until February 11, 2020, to file any reply. See Order for details. It is SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 1/23/20. (jsau, )
January 22, 2020 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (Court Reporter Harding, OCR): Motion Hearing held on 1/22/2020 re #2 Motion (Notice) to Substitute United States of America as Proper Party Defendant filed by Natalie C. Seiling and John T. Wait. Argument heard; motion granted. Plaintiff to file a response to defendants' Motion to Dismiss two weeks from today; defendants' reply due six days thereafter. (rpiz)
January 8, 2020 Set Hearings in case as to #2 Notice to Substitute Party: Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2020 at 11:00 AM in Richmond Courtroom 7000 before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (rpiz)
December 31, 2019 Filing 7 Response to #5 Objection to Certification and Substitution of US filed by Natalie C. Seiling, John T. Wait. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Amended Complaint), #3 Exhibit C (USA Certification))(Wu, Elizabeth)
December 18, 2019 Filing 6 Memorandum in Support of #6 Objection To #2 Substitution and Certification Filed By The United States of America filed by W. David Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Part 1, #2 Exhibit 1, Part 2, #3 Exhibit 2, Part 1, #4 Exhibit 2, Part 2, #5 Exhibit 3)(Brooks, Thomas) Modified docket text on 12/19/2019 (jsau, ).
December 18, 2019 Filing 5 Objection To #2 Substitution and Certification Filed By The United States of America filed by W. David Jones. (Brooks, Thomas) Modified docket text on 12/19/2019 (jsau, ).
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Natalie C. Seiling, John T. Wait. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1--DLA Declaration)(Wu, Elizabeth)
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by Natalie C. Seiling, John T. Wait. (Wu, Elizabeth)
December 4, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (jsau, )
December 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE (Motion) of Substitution of the United States of America as Proper Party Defendant and brief in support by Natalie C. Seiling and John T. Wait (Wu, Elizabeth) (modified on 1/8/2020 to change event to a pending motion - rpiz)
December 4, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal , filed by John T Wait, Natalie C Seiling. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Complaint, #2 Exhibit B--proposed Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C--Certification, #4 Exhibit D--Seiling Answer and Counterclaim)(Wu, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Seiling et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalie C. Seiling
Represented By: Colleen Marea Quinn
Represented By: Elizabeth Catherine Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John T. Wait
Represented By: Elizabeth Catherine Wu
Represented By: Joshua Lee Jewett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Elizabeth Catherine Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W. David Jones
Represented By: Thomas Noel Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?