Roark v. Saul
Plaintiff: Mary Roark
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Interested Party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Case Number: 3:2019cv00903
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John A Gibney
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONSES Returned Executed by U.S. Marshal's Office as to Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security and U.S. Attorney General. (walk, )
December 31, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate Reporting Service. Andrew Saul served on 12/20/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. (jsau, )
December 27, 2019 Filing 6 Marshal's Executed Return on Summons issued to Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security. (walk, )
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 Summonses Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney General and U.S. Attorney for EDVA re: #4 Order; forwarded to USMS with USM-285 forms. (walk, )
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that upon due consideration, Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #3 ) filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2) on December 5, 2019, is GRANTED. Plaintiff may proceed in this case without paying the Court's filing fee. The Clerk is DIRECTED to issue process and deliver the summons to the United States Marshal for service. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 12/06/2019. (walk, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mary Roark. (tjoh, )
December 5, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. (tjoh, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Mary Roark. (Cunningham, Joel)
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint filed by Mary Roark against Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 IFP Application). (Cunningham, Joel). Modified docket entry on 12/06/2019. (walk, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roark v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Elizabeth Catherine Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roark
Represented By: Joel C. Cunningham, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?