Williams et al v. Big Picture Loans LLC et al

Plaintiff: Renee Galloway, Dowin Coffy, Felix Gillison, Jr., Kevin Minor, Dianne Turner, George Hengle, Rose Marie Buchert, Gloria Turnage, Regina Nolte, Teresa Titus, Lula Williams and Earl Browne
Defendant: Susan McGeshick, Gertrude McGeshick, Ascension Technologies Incorporated, Big Picture Loans LLC, Matt Martorello, Daniel Gravel, Giiwegiizhigookway Martin and James Williams, Jr.
Petitioner: Rosette LLP
Case Number: 3:2019mc00002
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Office: Richmond Office
Presiding Judge: Robert E Payne
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Notice of Correction re: #39 Response in Support of Motion; Clerk notified filing attorney that the action number referenced was incorrect. Clerk requested that the attorney email the corrected documents to the Case Manager and upon receipt the document will be switched out and the NEF regenerated. (sbea, )
March 14, 2019 Filing 39 RESPONSE in Support re #35 MOTION to Seal filed by Rosette LLP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reilly, Craig)
March 7, 2019 Filing 38 Memorandum in Support re #35 MOTION to Seal filed by Dowin Coffy, Felix Gillison, Jr, George Hengle, Gloria Turnage, Lula Williams. (Kelly, Kristi)
March 7, 2019 Filing 37 Sealed Document re #35 MOTION to Seal . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7)(Kelly, Kristi)
March 7, 2019 Filing 36 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Dowin Coffy, Felix Gillison, Jr, George Hengle, Gloria Turnage, Lula Williams re #35 MOTION to Seal (Kelly, Kristi)
March 7, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION to Seal by Dowin Coffy, Felix Gillison, Jr, George Hengle, Gloria Turnage, Lula Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kelly, Kristi)
March 7, 2019 Filing 34 Memorandum in Support (Redacted) re: #33 MOTION to Compel Response to Subpoena Issued to Rosette, LLP filed by Dowin Coffy, Felix Gillison, Jr, George Hengle, Gloria Turnage, Lula Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Kelly, Kristi). Modified docket text on 3/8/2019 (sbea, ).
March 7, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION to Compel Response to Subpoena Issued to Rosette, LLP by Dowin Coffy, Felix Gillison, Jr, George Hengle, Gloria Turnage, Lula Williams. (Kelly, Kristi)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER that this Court hereby grants Plaintiffs' #30 Consent Motion to Modify Briefing Schedule. It is hereby ordered that Plaintiffs shall file any necessary motion to compel regarding Rosette's production on or before March 7, 2019; Rosette shall file any response to the Plaintiffs' motion to compel on or before March 21, 2019, and the Plaintiffs' shall file any reply to their motion to compel on or before March 28, 2019. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 3/6/2019. (jsmi, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 31 Memorandum in Support re #30 Consent MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedule filed by Dowin Coffy, Felix Gillison, Jr, George Hengle, Gloria Turnage, Lula Williams. (Kelly, Kristi)
March 5, 2019 Filing 30 Consent MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedule by Dowin Coffy, Felix Gillison, Jr, George Hengle, Gloria Turnage, Lula Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kelly, Kristi)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER that this Court hereby grants Plaintiffs' Consent Motion to Modify Briefing Schedule. It is hereby ordered that Plaintiffs shall file any necessary motion to compel regarding Rosette's production on or before March 5, 2019; Rosette shall file any response to the Plaintiffs' motion to compel on or before March 19, 2019, and the Plaintiffs' shall file any reply to their motion to compel on or before March 26, 2019. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 2/25/2019. (jsmi, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 28 Memorandum in Support re #27 Consent MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedule filed by Dowin Coffy, Felix Gillison, Jr, George Hengle, Gloria Turnage, Lula Williams. (Kelly, Kristi)
February 19, 2019 Filing 27 Consent MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedule by Dowin Coffy, Felix Gillison, Jr, George Hengle, Gloria Turnage, Lula Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kelly, Kristi)
January 28, 2019 Filing 26 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on January 24, 2019, before Judge Robert E. Payne, Court Reporter Peppy Peterson, Telephone number 804-916-2267. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have thirty (30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 2/27/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/1/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/29/2019.(peterson, peppy) (Main Document 26 replaced on 1/29/2019) (jtho, ).
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER that the parties in William V. Big Picture Loans, LLC, No. 3:17-cv-461, shall comply with the following schedule in relation to the plaintiffs' subpoena upon Rosette: the plaintiffs shall modify their subpoena to Rosette by January 29, 2019; after the subpoena is modified and before February 19, 2019, counsel shall meet and confer to resolve any disputes about the subpoena; if Rosette continues to object to any part of the modified subpoena, the plaintiffs shall file any motion to compel production by February 19, 2019; Rosette shall file any response to the plaintiffs' motion to compel by March 5, 2019; the plaintiffs shall file any reply to the plaintiffs' motion to compel by March 12, 2019. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 1/25/2019. (jsmi, )
January 24, 2019 Filing 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Robert E. Payne: Motion to Quash Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objections and Motion for Protective Order Hearing held on 1/24/2019. Modifications to subpoena due 01/29/2019, objection due 02/12/2019; any motion to compel thereafter should be filed by 02/19/2019, response by 03/05/2019, reply by 03/12/2019; Court set oral argument in 3:17-cv-461 regarding plaintiff's motion for entry of order (#303) at 10:00 a.m. on 02/04/2019; parties to confer and present any agreed order at that time. (Court Reporter Peppy Peterson, OCR.) (nbrow)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTED #18 Motion for Pro hac vice Timothy Andrew Nelson for Nonparty Rosette, LLP. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 01/22/2019. (ccol, )
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTED #19 Motion for Pro hac vice Terry Goddard for Nonparty Rosette, LLC. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 01/22/2019. (ccol, )
January 18, 2019 Set Hearing: Motion to Quash Hearing set for 1/24/2019 at 01:30 PM in Richmond Courtroom 7400 before District Judge Robert E. Payne. (nbrow)
January 17, 2019 Filing 19 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Terry Goddard and Certification of Local Counsel Craig C. Reilly Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6452095. by Rosette LLP. (Reilly, Craig)
January 17, 2019 Filing 18 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Timothy A. Nelson and Certification of Local Counsel Craig C. Reilly Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6452094. by Rosette LLP. (Reilly, Craig)
January 17, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Crandall Reilly on behalf of Rosette LLP (Reilly, Craig)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER that on January 24 at 1:30 p.m., a hearing shall take place on the MOTION TO QUASH PLAINTIFFS' SUBPOENAS TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS, INFORMATION, OR OBJECTS AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT (ECF No. #2 ); the OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA UNDERLYING ACTIONS: WILLIAMS V. BIG PICTURE LOANS, LLC., 3:17CV461 (E.D.VA.); AND GALLOWAY V. BIG PICTURE LOANS, LLC., 3:18CV406 (E.D.VA.) AND REQUEST FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES & COSTS AS SANCTIONS (ECF No. #8 ); and REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ROSETTE'S MOTION TO QUASH (ECF No. #10 ) in Courtroom 7400 of the Spottswood W. Robinson III and Robert R. Merhige, Jr. Federal Courthouse, 701 East Broad Street, Richmond, VA 23219. Given the text of the defendants' motions, the Order bears the style of both cases, and briefing will as to both cases. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Senior United States District Judge Robert E. Payne on 1/16/2019. (sbea, )
January 16, 2019 Filing 15 Letter by Clerk re: Local Rule 83.1. (Attachment: #1 Local Rule 83.1). Letter was electronically sent to attorneys representing Rosette, LLP. (sbea, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:18-mc-00066. Original file and docket sheet received.
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED granting Petitioner's Motion for Order Nunc Pro Tunc to Correct Filing Date (Doc. #7 ). Petitioner's Motion to Quash (Doc. #2 ) is deemed filed with this Court at 1:23 p.m. on December 12, 2018. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting in part Respondents' "Opposition to Motion to Quash Subpoena Underlying Actions [sic]: Williams v. Big Picture Loans, LLC, 3:17cv461 (E.D. Va.); and Galloway v. Big Picture Loans, LLC, 3:18cv406 (E.D. Va.) and Request for Award of Attorneys Fees & Costs as Sanctions" (Doc. #8 ). Respondents' request to transfer this matter to the Eastern District of Virginia is granted, and Respondents' request for an award of sanctions is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall take all necessary steps to ensure the prompt transfer of this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia. (See document for complete details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 1/11/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 1/14/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE re: Notice of Supplemental Authority by Rosette LLP . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit to Notice)(Nelson, Timothy) [Transferred from Arizona on 1/14/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE re: Supplemental Authority by Lula Williams re: #8 MOTION for Sanctions . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order in Williams v. Big Picture Loans)(Rotkis, Susan) [Transferred from Arizona on 1/14/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 *REPLY to Response to Motion re: #2 Miscellaneous Case Opening by Movant Rosette LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 5 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order in pdf for record)(Nelson, Timothy) *Modified to correct event and text on 12/26/2018 (REK). [Transferred from Arizona on 1/14/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rosette LLP. (Nelson, Timothy) [Transferred from Arizona on 1/14/2019.]
December 14, 2018 Filing 8 *MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs as Sanctions, RESPONSE in Opposition re: #7 MOTION Correct Filing Date as to #2 Motions to Quash Subpoenas Duces Tecum filed by Teresa Titus, Gloria Turnage, Dianne Turner, Lula Williams, George Hengle, Dowin Coffy, Felix Gillison, Jr., Renee Galloway, Earl Browne, Rose Marie Buchert, Regina Nolte, Kevin Minor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Leonard A. Bennett, #2 Text of Proposed Order Denying Motion to Quash)(Rotkis, Susan) *Modified to add additional document link and additional filers on 12/17/2018 (REK). *Modified to add motion part on 12/26/2018 (REK). [Transferred from Arizona on 1/14/2019.]
December 14, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION Correct Filing Date by Rosette LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Filing Fee Paid, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Email to Client, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Affidavit)(Nelson, Timothy) [Transferred from Arizona on 1/14/2019.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 6 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: 5 Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) Arizona Civil Cover Sheet by Movant Rosette LLP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Nelson, Timothy) [Transferred from Arizona on 1/14/2019.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #2 Miscellaneous Case Opening filed by Rosette LLP. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile with correct PDF document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SIB) [Transferred from Arizona on 1/14/2019.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Rosette LLP. (SIB) [Transferred from Arizona on 1/14/2019.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16304137. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: MC 18-66-PHX-JJT. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SIB) [Transferred from Arizona on 1/14/2019.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 *Miscellaneous Case Opening Regarding: Motions to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum - FRCVP 45. Case Opening Fee Received: $ 47.00 receipt number 0970-16304137 filed by Rosette LLP. (Nelson, Timothy) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(SIB) *Added MOTION for Protective Order on 12/26/2018 (REK). [Transferred from Arizona on 1/14/2019.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 *NOTICE of Appearance by Susan Mary Rotkis on behalf of Lula Williams, Gloria Turnage, George Hengle, Dowin Coffy, Felix Gillison, Jr., Reneee Galloway, Dianne Turner, Earl Browne, Rose Marie Buchert, Regina Nolte, Kevin Minor, Teresa Titus. (Rotkis, Susan) *Modified to add additional filers on 12/14/2018 (REK). [Transferred from Arizona on 1/14/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams et al v. Big Picture Loans LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan McGeshick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gertrude McGeshick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ascension Technologies Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Picture Loans LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Martorello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Gravel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giiwegiizhigookway Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Williams, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Galloway
Represented By: Susan Mary Rotkis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dowin Coffy
Represented By: Susan Mary Rotkis
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix Gillison, Jr.
Represented By: Susan Mary Rotkis
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Minor
Represented By: Susan Mary Rotkis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianne Turner
Represented By: Susan Mary Rotkis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Hengle
Represented By: Susan Mary Rotkis
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Marie Buchert
Represented By: Susan Mary Rotkis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Turnage
Represented By: Susan Mary Rotkis
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Nolte
Represented By: Susan Mary Rotkis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Titus
Represented By: Susan Mary Rotkis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lula Williams
Represented By: Susan Mary Rotkis
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Browne
Represented By: Susan Mary Rotkis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rosette LLP
Represented By: Timothy Andrew Nelson
Represented By: Terry Goddard
Represented By: Craig Crandall Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?