Plumbers and Steamfitters Union Local No. 10 v. Waters
Plaintiff: Plumbers and Steamfitters Union Local No. 10
Defendant: Stuart Waters
Case Number: 3:2020cv00003
Filed: January 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: David J Novak
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:0401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by Plumbers and Steamfitters Union Local No. 10 Notice of Intent to Appear in Pretrial Conference via Telephone (Richardson, Rebecca)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Setting Pretrial Conference set for 3/2/2020 at 11:00 AM in Richmond Judges Chamber before District Judge David J. Novak. Signed by Patrick F. Dillard with permission of District Judge David J. Novak on 2/24/2020. (cgar)
February 24, 2020 Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/2/2020 at 11:00 AM in Richmond Judges Chamber before District Judge David J. Novak. (cgar)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order setting pretrial conference for March 2, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Patrick F. Dillard with the permission of District Judge David J. Novak on 2/24/2020. (cgar)
February 14, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Stuart Waters. (Anderson, Matthew)
February 10, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Plumbers and Steamfitters Union Local No. 10. (Richardson, Rebecca)
January 27, 2020 Filing 8 Memorandum in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Stuart Waters. (Anderson, Matthew)
January 27, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Stuart Waters. (Anderson, Matthew)
January 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Traynham Anderson on behalf of Stuart Waters (Anderson, Matthew)
January 14, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Plumbers and Steamfitters Union Local No. 10. Stuart Waters served on 01/08/2020, Answer due 01/29/2020 . (Richardson, Rebecca). Modified docket entry on 01/14/2020. (walk, ).
January 3, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Stuart Waters. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for the Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon the Defendant. Please ask your process server to return the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (walk, )
January 3, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge David J. Novak. (walk, )
January 2, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Plumbers and Steamfitters Union Local No. 10. (Richardson, Rebecca).
January 2, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Plumbers and Steamfitters Union Local No. 10. (Richardson, Rebecca)
January 2, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint filed by Plumbers and Steamfitters Union Local No. 10 against Stuart Waters. (Filing Fee Paid: $400, Receipt Number: 0422-7006551). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Richardson, Rebecca). (Additional attachment added on 1/2/2020: #2 Exhibit A). (jsau, ). Modified docket entry on 01/03/2020 and regenerated NEF. (walk, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plumbers and Steamfitters Union Local No. 10 v. Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart Waters
Represented By: Matthew Traynham Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plumbers and Steamfitters Union Local No. 10
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?