Harris v. Herring
Plaintiff: Susan M. Harris
Defendant: Mark R. Herring
Case Number: 3:2020cv00096
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John A Gibney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:0206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Mark R. Herring.(Daniel, Bret)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying as moot #7 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 03/30/2020. (tjoh, )
March 26, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mark R. Herring, filed by Susan M. Harris.(Thorsen, James)
March 10, 2020 Filing 8 Memorandum in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Count IV and Count V filed by Mark R. Herring. (Ebanks, Elizabeth)
March 10, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Count IV and Count V by Mark R. Herring. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ebanks, Elizabeth)
March 10, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Mark R. Herring.(Ebanks, Elizabeth)
March 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Marie Ebanks on behalf of Mark R. Herring (Ebanks, Elizabeth)
March 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Bret Gregory Daniel on behalf of Mark R. Herring (Daniel, Bret)
February 13, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Mark R. Herring. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Remove header and print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (tjoh, )
February 13, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. (tjoh, )
February 13, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Susan M. Harris. (Thorsen, James)
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7073564.), filed by Susan M. Harris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thorsen, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan M. Harris
Represented By: James Broome Thorsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark R. Herring
Represented By: Bret Gregory Daniel
Represented By: Elizabeth Marie Ebanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?