Barker v. Dominion Energy, Inc.
Plaintiff: Robert Barker, Nicholas Nimmo and Chris Sziber
Defendant: Dominion Energy, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00117
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John A Gibney
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15:1938
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2020 Notice of Correction re #5 Summons Returned Executed. Document number (5) was missing the first page of the summons. The filing user is notified to file the entire summons along with the service affidavit. The Clerk has corrected the docket entry. (tjoh, )
April 14, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Barker Dominion Energy, Inc. served on 4/7/2020, answer due 4/28/2020 (Antell, Zev) (Main Document 5 replaced on 4/15/2020) (tjoh, ).
April 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Robert Barker Consent to Join Suit as a Party Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consents of Nicholas Nimmo and Chris Sziber)(Antell, Zev)
February 21, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Dominion Energy, Inc.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (tjoh, )
February 21, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. (tjoh, )
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Robert Barker. (Butler, Harris)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7084542.), filed by Robert Barker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Butler, Harris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barker v. Dominion Energy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominion Energy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Barker
Represented By: Harris Dewey Butler, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Nimmo
Represented By: Harris Dewey Butler, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Sziber
Represented By: Harris Dewey Butler, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?