Herek v. The Old Dominion Club of Richmond et al
Plaintiff: Teal Herek
Defendant: Does 1-10, Michael Dickinson, Chris Kourdoglov, William Pyliaris, Charles Hayes, Mike Pittas and The Old Dominion Club of Richmond
Case Number: 3:2020cv00119
Filed: February 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Referring Judge: M Hannah Lauck
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint by Michael Dickinson, Does 1-10, Charles Hayes, Chris Kourdoglov, Mike Pittas, The Old Dominion Club of Richmond.(Telfair, Brian)
April 20, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Teal Herek. (Long, Suzanne) Modified docket text on 4/21/2020 (jsau, ).
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER: with Attachment #1 Pretrial Schedule A - Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/7/2020 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Henry E. Hudson; conference to occur via telephone (Order issued by deputy clerk at the direction of the Court) (rpiz)
March 25, 2020 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Teal Herek The Old Dominion Club of Richmond served on 3/16/2020, answer due 4/6/2020 (Long, Suzanne) (Main Document 23 replaced on 3/26/2020) (jsau, ).
March 23, 2020 Filing 22 Memorandum in Support re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Michael Dickinson, Does 1-10, Charles Hayes, Chris Kourdoglov, Mike Pittas, The Old Dominion Club of Richmond. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Michael Dickinson, #2 Exhibit ODC Bylaws Pages 1 - 13, #3 Exhibit ODC Bylaws Pages 14 - 27, #4 Exhibit ODC Articles of Incorporation)(Telfair, Brian)
March 23, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION for Summary Judgment by Michael Dickinson, Does 1-10, Charles Hayes, Chris Kourdoglov, Mike Pittas, The Old Dominion Club of Richmond. (Telfair, Brian)
March 23, 2020 Filing 20 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by The Old Dominion Club of Richmond. (Telfair, Brian)
March 23, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian K. Telfair on behalf of Michael Dickinson, Does 1-10, Charles Hayes, Chris Kourdoglov, Mike Pittas, The Old Dominion Club of Richmond (Telfair, Brian)
March 19, 2020 Notice of Correction re #17 Summons Returned Executed, #15 Summons Returned Executed, #18 Summons Returned Executed, #16 Summons Returned Executed. Filing attorney notified of proper procedures when filing a Summons Return. Clerk has replaced the documents to correct the filing format. No further action is required. (jsau, )
March 19, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Teal Herek Mike Pittas served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020 (Long, Suzanne) (Main Document 18 replaced on 3/19/2020) (jsau, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/19/2020: #1 Attorney Notice) (jsau, ).
March 19, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Teal Herek Michael Dickinson served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020 (Long, Suzanne) (Main Document 17 replaced on 3/19/2020) (jsau, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/19/2020: #1 Attorney Notice) (jsau, ).
March 19, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Teal Herek Chris Kourdoglov served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020 (Long, Suzanne) (Main Document 16 replaced on 3/19/2020) (jsau, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/19/2020: #1 Attorney Notice) (jsau, ).
March 19, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Teal Herek Charles Hayes served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020 (Long, Suzanne) (Main Document 15 replaced on 3/19/2020) (jsau, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/19/2020: #1 Attorney Notice) (jsau, ).
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. THIS MATTER is before the Court on Plaintiff Teal Herek's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant William Pyliaris filed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4l(a)(1)(A)(i) #13 . Upon due consideration, and it appearing appropriate to do so, Defendant William Pyliaris is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE from this matter. It is SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 3/13/20. (jsau, )
March 13, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal William Pyliaris by Teal Herek (Long, Suzanne)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Jacob Joseph Ventura to appear Pro hac vice for Teal Herek. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 3/11/20. (jsau, )
March 10, 2020 Case Reassigned to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. District Judge M. Hannah Lauck no longer assigned to the case. (jsau, )
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on its own initiative. The Court finds it in the interest of judicial efficiency to reassign this case to the Honorable Henry Hudson. Accordingly, the Court DIRECTS the Clerk to REASSIGN this case to Judge Hudson in accordance with the Clerk's standard assignment procedure. It is SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 3/10/20. (jsau, )
March 9, 2020 Notice of Correction re #10 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jacob Joseph Ventura and Certification of Local Counsel Suzanne S. Long. Filing attorney notified of correct procedures for filing a Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Clerk has corrected the docket. No further action is required. (jsau, )
March 6, 2020 Filing 10 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jacob Joseph Ventura and Certification of Local Counsel Suzanne S. Long Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7109115. by Teal Herek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Long, Suzanne) (Main Document 10 replaced on 3/9/2020) (jsau, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/9/2020) (jsau, ).
February 24, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Michael Dickinson, Charles Hayes, Chris Kourdoglov, Mike Pittas, William Pyliaris, The Old Dominion Club of Richmond. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: REMOVE HEADERS Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (jsau, )
February 24, 2020 Filing 8 Corrected Proposed Summons by Teal Herek. (Long, Suzanne) Modified docket text on 2/24/2020 (jsau, ).
February 24, 2020 Notice of Correction #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons. Filing attorney notified of proper procedures for proposed summonses. Clerk has replaced document #1 -1 as it was an incorrectly saved PDF fillable form. Filing attorney to refile corrected summonses. (jsau, )
February 24, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (jsau, )
February 23, 2020 Filing 7 **DISREGARD** Proposed Summons William Pyliaris by Teal Herek. (Long, Suzanne) Modified on 2/24/2020 (jsau, ).
February 23, 2020 Filing 6 **DISREGARD** Proposed Summons Mike Pittas by Teal Herek. (Long, Suzanne) Modified on 2/24/2020 (jsau, ).
February 23, 2020 Filing 5 **DISREGARD** Proposed Summons ODC of Richmond by Teal Herek. (Long, Suzanne) Modified on 2/24/2020 (jsau, ).
February 23, 2020 Filing 4 **DISREGARD** Proposed Summons Chris Kurdoglov by Teal Herek. (Long, Suzanne) Modified on 2/24/2020 (jsau, ).
February 23, 2020 Filing 3 **DISREGARD** Proposed Summons Chris Hayes by Teal Herek. (Long, Suzanne) Modified on 2/24/2020 (jsau, ).
February 23, 2020 Filing 2 **DISREGARD** Proposed Summons Michael Dickinson by Teal Herek. (Long, Suzanne) Modified on 2/24/2020 (jsau, ).
February 23, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7087104.), filed by Teal Herek. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Long, Suzanne) (Main Document 1 replaced on 2/24/2020) (jsau, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/24/2020) (jsau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herek v. The Old Dominion Club of Richmond et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Represented By: Brian K. Telfair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Dickinson
Represented By: Brian K. Telfair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Kourdoglov
Represented By: Brian K. Telfair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Pyliaris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Hayes
Represented By: Brian K. Telfair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Pittas
Represented By: Brian K. Telfair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Old Dominion Club of Richmond
Represented By: Brian K. Telfair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teal Herek
Represented By: Suzanne Sones Long
Represented By: David Avard Chipman Long
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Ventura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?