Davis v. Unknown
Appellant: Darlene Denise Davis
Appellee: Unknown
Interested Party: USBC-Richmond (United States Bankruptcy Court)
Case Number: 3:2020cv00205
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: M Hannah Lauck
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2020 Filing 4 Bankruptcy Transmittal Cover Sheet with Designation of Record. (Attachments: #1 Designation of Record) (smej, )
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Accordingly, no later than Friday, May 15, 2020, Davis shall remit the filing fee as required by Rule 8003, file a motion to proceed informa pauperis, or show cause for why she has not paid the fee. The Court cautions Davis that failure to comply with this Order will result in dismissal of her appeal. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to send this Order and a copy of the informa pauperis affidavit to Davis at her address of record. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 4/3/2020. (smej, )
March 25, 2020 Filing 2 Letter from Clerk re: Rule 8018. Letter along with attachment was mailed to pro se plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Rule 8018) (smej, )
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-36077-KLP, filed by Darlene Denise Davis. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal 1 - Prior to Order Entered, #2 Appeal 2 - After Order Entered) (smej, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Darlene Denise Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: USBC-Richmond (United States Bankruptcy Court)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?