Bruce E. Katz M.D. P.C. v. Cordell Medical Remarketing Corporation
Plaintiff: Bruce E. Katz M.D. P.C. doing business as Juva Skin and Laser Center and Bruce E. Katz M.D. P.C. individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated doing business as Juva Skin and Laser Center
Defendant: Cordell Medical Remarketing Corporation
Case Number: 3:2020cv00550
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John A Gibney
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Cordell Medical Remarketing Corporation.(Shields, William)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Patrick Harry Peluso to appear as Pro hac vice for Bruce E. Katz M.D. P.C.. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 8/3/2020. (smej, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Patrick H. Peluso and Certification of Local Counsel Francis J. Driscoll, Jr. Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7332170. by Bruce E. Katz M.D. P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Addendum to Peluso Pro Hac Vice App)(Driscoll, Francis)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cordell Medical Remarketing Corporation. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (smej, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Bruce E. Katz M.D. P.C.. (Driscoll, Francis)
July 17, 2020 Filing attorney notified to file proposed summons. (jsmi, )
July 17, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. (jsmi, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint (Filing Fee $400.00, Receipt # 0422-7305086 filed by Bruce E. Katz M.D. P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Driscoll, Francis) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/17/2020) (jsmi, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruce E. Katz M.D. P.C. v. Cordell Medical Remarketing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cordell Medical Remarketing Corporation
Represented By: William Gilbert Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce E. Katz M.D. P.C. doing business as Juva Skin and Laser Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce E. Katz M.D. P.C. individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated doing business as Juva Skin and Laser Center
Represented By: Patrick Harry Peluso
Represented By: Francis John Driscoll, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?