Scruggs v. Saul
Plaintiff: Marquitta Chontrease Wrig Scruggs
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Interested Party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Case Number: 3:2020cv00573
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: M Hannah Lauck
Nature of Suit: Social Security: Black Lung
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Filing 11 Marshal's Return on Executed Summonses Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney General and U.S. Attorney for the Eastern District of Virginia. (walk, )
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER. Effective immediately, if all parties in a Social Security Appeal consent to have the matter heard by a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), the matter shall be reassigned to United States Magistrate Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes for all purposes. If the parties do not consent to have the matter heard by a United States Magistrate Judge, the case shall be referred to Judge Hanes for Report and Recommendation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B). And it is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 06/19/2020. (walk, )
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (please see Standing Order for additional information.) It is so ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Novak on 07/20/2018. (walk, )
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REVISED STANDING ORDER IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (please see Revised Standing Order for additional information.) It is so ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Novak on 10/17/2017. (walk, )
August 12, 2020 Filing 7 Certificate Reporting Service by Andrew Saul. Andrew Saul served on 8/7/2020, answer due 10/6/2020. (Hambrick, Jonathan)
August 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Holland Hambrick on behalf of Andrew Saul (Hambrick, Jonathan)
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 Summonses Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney General and U.S. Attorney for the Eastern District of Virginia; forwarded to USMS with USM-285 forms. (walk, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT filed by Marquitta Chontrease Wrig Scruggs against Andrew Saul; filed pursuant to the Court's #3 Order. (walk, )
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that upon due consideration, Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #1 ) filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a) on July 29, 2020, is GRANTED. Plaintiff may proceed in this case without paying the Court's filing fee. The Clerk is DIRECTED to issue process and deliver the summons to the United States Marshal for service. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes on 08/03/2020. (walk, )
July 29, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (walk, )
July 29, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Marquitta Chontrease Wrig Scruggs. (Cunningham, Joel)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees and Costs filed by Marquitta Chontrease Wrig Scruggs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Complaint). (Cunningham, Joel). Corrected docket entry and regenerated NEF. (walk, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scruggs v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Jonathan Holland Hambrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquitta Chontrease Wrig Scruggs
Represented By: Joel C. Cunningham, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?