BMO Harris Bank N.A. v. S & F Logistics, LLC et al
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Defendant: S & F Logistics, LLC and Fernando Navia
Case Number: 3:2020cv00574
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: M Hannah Lauck
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/22/2020 at 11:30 AM in Richmond Remote before District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (khan, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that counsel shall confer with their respective clients and with each other to determine whether all parties will consent to assignment of the case to a Magistrate Judge as the presiding judicial officer. To that end, counsel for the defendant shall ensure that the foregoing conferences occur not later than OCTOBER 6, 2020, and that the Court is informed not later than 5:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 9/22/20. (khan, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 9/22/20. (khan, )
August 26, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BMO Harris Bank N.A. Fernando Navia served on 8/20/2020, answer due 9/10/2020 (Stewart, George)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 S & F Logistics, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint by S & F Logistics, LLC.(Bredimus, Frank)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 Fernando Navia's ANSWER to Complaint by Fernando Navia.(Bredimus, Frank)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BMO Harris Bank N.A. S & F Logistics, LLC served on 8/5/2020, answer due 8/26/2020 (Stewart, George)
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 Summonses Issued as to Fernando Navia and S & F Logistics, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ask your process server to return the service copies (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file them using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (walk, )
July 29, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (walk, )
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Stewart, George). Modified docket entry on 07/29/2020 and regenerated NEF. (walk, ).
July 29, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Stewart, George)
July 29, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Stewart, George)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 Verified Complaint filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A. against S & F Logistics, LLC, et al. (Filing Fee Paid: $400.00, Receipt Number: 0422-7325836). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L and #13 Exhibit M). (Stewart, George). Modified docket entry on 07/29/2020 and regenerated NEF. (walk, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BMO Harris Bank N.A. v. S & F Logistics, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S & F Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Frank B. Bredimus, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fernando Navia
Represented By: Frank B. Bredimus, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Represented By: George Edward Stewart, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?