Morrison v. Commonwealth of Virginia
Petitioner: Leonard Allen Morrison
Respondent: Commonwealth of Virginia
Case Number: 3:2020cv00576
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: M Hannah Lauck
Referring Judge: Roderick C Young
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that the action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and a certificate of appealability isDENIED. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 09/08/2020. Copy mailed to Morrison.(tjoh, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 09/08/2020. Copy mailed to Morrison. (tjoh, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 Letter RECEIVED from Leonard Allen Morrison re: Exhausting Remedies. (Attachments: #1 Letter from Attorney, #2 Envelope). (sbea,)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM ORDER (Directing Petitioner to Show Cause for Lack of Exhaustion) Petitioner is DIRECTED to show cause, within eleven (11) days of date of entry hereof, as to why his 2254 Petition should not be dismissed for lack of exhaustion. Failure to do so will result in the dismissal of the 2254 Petition without prejudice to re-file after Petitioner has exhausted his state court remedies for all of his claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roderick C. Young on 08/10/2020. Copy mailed to Petitioner.(tjoh, )
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION Under 28 U.S.C. 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody filed by Leonard Allen Morrison. (Attachment: #1 Envelope). (walk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morrison v. Commonwealth of Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Leonard Allen Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Commonwealth of Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?