Gibbs et al v. Elevate Credit, Inc.
Plaintiff: Darlene Gibbs, Patrick Inscho, Jeri Brennan, Alicia Patterson, Stephanie Edwards, Sharon Burney, Jill Novorot, Lawrence Mwethuku, Chastity McNeil, Lula Williams, Earl Browne and Kimetra Brice
Defendant: Elevate Credit, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00632
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: M Hannah Lauck
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sharon Burney, Kimetra Brice, Lula Williams, Chastity McNeil, Jeri Brennan, Jill Novorot, Stephanie Edwards, Alicia Patterson, Darlene Gibbs, Patrick Inscho, Earl Browne. Elevate Credit, Inc. waiver sent on 8/25/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Kelly, Kristi)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 So Ordered. LAWRENCE MWETHUKU'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT ELEVATE CREDIT, INC. Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff Lawrence Mwethuku hereby dismiss the above-styled action without prejudice against the Defendant, who has yet to file an answer or a motion for summary judgment. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 9/16/2020. (sbea,)
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Elevate Credit, Inc., filed by Sharon Burney, Kimetra Brice, Lula Williams, Chastity McNeil, Jeri Brennan, Jill Novorot, Stephanie Edwards, Alicia Patterson, Darlene Gibbs, Patrick Inscho, Earl Browne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18)(Kelly, Kristi)
September 15, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal (only as to Plaintiff Lawrence Mwethuku) by Lawrence Mwethuku (Kelly, Kristi)
September 15, 2020 Notice of Correction; Clerk received Waiver of the Service of Summons. Clerk notified filing attorneys that this document should be filed electronically and to enter the appropriate date to set the answer due date. (sbea,)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Elevate Credit, Inc. **NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for the Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon the Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (sbea, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Jeri Brennan, Kimetra Brice, Earl Browne, Sharon Burney, Stephanie Edwards, Darlene Gibbs, Patrick Inscho, Chastity McNeil, Lawrence Mwethuku, Jill Novorot, Alicia Patterson, Lula Williams. (Kelly, Kristi)
August 14, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (sbea,)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 Class Action Complaint (Filing Fee: $400, Receipt Number: 0422-7353309), filed by Sharon Burney, Kimetra Brice, Lula Williams, Chastity McNeil, Jeri Brennan, Jill Novorot, Stephanie Edwards, Alicia Patterson, Darlene Gibbs, Patrick Inscho, Earl Browne, Lawrence Mwethuku. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kelly, Kristi). Modified docket text on 8/17/2020. (sbea,)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibbs et al v. Elevate Credit, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Gibbs
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Leonard Anthony Bennett
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Inscho
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Leonard Anthony Bennett
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeri Brennan
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Leonard Anthony Bennett
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Patterson
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Leonard Anthony Bennett
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Edwards
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Leonard Anthony Bennett
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Burney
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Leonard Anthony Bennett
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Novorot
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Leonard Anthony Bennett
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Mwethuku
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Leonard Anthony Bennett
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chastity McNeil
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Leonard Anthony Bennett
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lula Williams
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Leonard Anthony Bennett
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Browne
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Leonard Anthony Bennett
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimetra Brice
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Leonard Anthony Bennett
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elevate Credit, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?