Rego v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Aungelika Rego
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Case Number: 3:2020cv00643
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Filing 12 Marshal's Return on Executed Summonses as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney General and U.S. Attorney for the Eastern District of Virginia. (walk, )
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER. Effective immediately, if all parties in a Social Security Appeal consent to have the matter heard by a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), the matter shall be reassigned to United States Magistrate Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes for all purposes. If the parties do not consent to have the matter heard by a United States Magistrate Judge, the case shall be referred to Judge Hanes for Report and Recommendation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B). And it is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 06/19/2020. (walk, )
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (please see Standing Order for additional information.) It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 07/20/2018. (walk, )
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REVISED STANDING ORDER IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (please see Revised Standing Order for additional information.) It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 10/17/2013. (walk, )
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 Certificate Reporting Service by Commissioner of Social Security. Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/27/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Wu, Elizabeth)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Catherine Wu on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Wu, Elizabeth)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 Summonses Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney General and U.S. Attorney for the Eastern District of Virginia; forwarded to USMS with USM-285 forms. (walk, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT filed by Aungelika Rego against Commissioner of Social Security; filed pursuant to the Court's #4 Order. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A). (walk, )
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that upon due consideration, Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #1 ) filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a) on August 19, 2020, is GRANTED. Plaintiff may proceed in this case without paying the Court's filing fee. The Clerk is DIRECTED to issue process and deliver the summons to the United States Marshal for service. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes on 08/21/2020. (walk, )
August 20, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (walk, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa A. Palmer and Certification of Local Counsel John O. Goss. Filing Fee Paid: $ 75, Receipt Number: 0422-7358941 by Aungelika Rego. (Goss, John). Modified docket entry on 08/20/2020 and regenerated NEF. (walk, ).
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Aungelika Rego. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 USM-285 Forms, #4 USM-285 Forms, #5 USM-285 Form). (Goss, John)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Aungelika Rego. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet and #3 Complaint). (walk, ). Modified docket entry on 08/20/2020 and regenerated NEF. (walk, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rego v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Elizabeth Catherine Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aungelika Rego
Represented By: John Osborne Goss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?