Vuly Pty Ltd v. Yang
Plaintiff: Vuly Pty Ltd
Defendant: Wei Yang
Case Number: 3:2020cv00665
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: David J Novak
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:281
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - This matter comes before the Court on Vuly Pty Ltd's ("Plaintiff) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #8 pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(i). Because Defendant has not filed either an answer or a motion for summary judgment, the Court hereby DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE all claims by Plaintiff against Defendant. This case is now CLOSED. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 9/25/2020. (smej, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Vuly Pty Ltd (Mandell, Adam)
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Wei Yang. Signed and sealed summons and hague form mailed to plaintiff's counsel. (Attachments: #1 Hague Form) (smej, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Vuly Pty Ltd for Hague Form for Service (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Mandell, Adam)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Governing Procedures Until the IPC --SEE ORDER FOR ALL DETAILS. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 9/3/2020. (cgar)
August 31, 2020 Notice of Correction re #3 Proposed Summons. The filing user has been notified service on the defendant is outside of the United States. The proper paperwork and any additional fees must be paid to the Clerk's Office, depending on how they choose to serve the defendant. (tjoh, )
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark(s) 9,399,152. (tjoh, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons for Wei Yang by Vuly Pty Ltd. (Mandell, Adam)
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Vuly Pty Ltd. (Mandell, Adam)
August 25, 2020 Notice of Correction re #1 Complaint: Filing attorney has been instructed to file proposed summons to serve defendants, or if waiving service, to notify the court in writing by electronically filing the notice. The filing attorney has also been instructed to file the Financial Disclosure Statement using the correct docket event. (smej, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint For Misappropriation, Tortious Interference With Business Expectancy, And Declaratory Judgement Of Patent Ownership (Filing Fee: $400.00, Receipt Number: 0422-7366190), filed by Vuly Pty Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Financial Disclosure) (Mandell, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vuly Pty Ltd v. Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wei Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vuly Pty Ltd
Represented By: Adam David Mandell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?