Jones v. Virginia Commonwealth University et al
Plaintiff: Wilda Carr Jones
Defendant: Virginia Commonwealth University and Pamela Parsons
Case Number: 3:2020cv00792
Filed: October 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John A Gibney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2020 Filing 6 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Pamela Parsons, Virginia Commonwealth University. (Regnery, Ronald)
October 23, 2020 Filing 5 Memorandum in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Wilda Carr Jones. (Queen, Barbara)
October 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara Allyn Queen on behalf of Wilda Carr Jones (Queen, Barbara)
October 9, 2020 Filing 3 Memorandum in Support re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Pamela Parsons, Virginia Commonwealth University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Regnery, Ronald)
October 9, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Pamela Parsons, Virginia Commonwealth University. (Regnery, Ronald)
October 8, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. (asho, )
October 8, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal (Filing Fee $400, Receipt Number 0422-7436315), filed by Virginia Commonwealth University, Pamela Parsons. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Demurrer, #3 Exhibit Notice of Filing in State Court)(Norris, George) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/8/2020) (asho, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Virginia Commonwealth University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilda Carr Jones
Represented By: Dominique LaRae Young
Represented By: Barbara Allyn Queen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Commonwealth University
Represented By: Ronald Nicholas Regnery
Represented By: George William Norris, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Parsons
Represented By: Ronald Nicholas Regnery
Represented By: George William Norris, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?