Mann et al v. Gomez et al
Plaintiff: Lashell Epperson, Kevin Williams, Judith Harrison and Steven Mann
Defendant: John Doe Nos. 1-15, Alonzo Primus, Chris McCloud, Philip Burgess, Microbilt Financial Services Corporation, Vivian McCloud, Princeton Alternative Income Fund, L.P., LJP Consulting, LLC, Princeton Alternative Funding, LLC, Walter Wojciechowski, Michael Gomez and Philip Gomez
Case Number: 3:2020cv00820
Filed: October 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert E Payne
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that the CONSENT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (ECF No. 17) is granted. It is further ORDERED that, by January 8, 2021, the plaintiffs shall file their response to DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 11(b) (1-3) (ECF No. 15). Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 12/18/2020. (smej, )
December 14, 2020 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION for Sanctions Against Plaintiffs' Counsel Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11(b)(1-3) by Lashell Epperson, Judith Harrison, Steven Mann, Kevin Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bennett, Leonard)
December 8, 2020 Filing 16 Memorandum in Support re #15 MOTION for Sanctions Against Plaintiffs' Counsel Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11(b)(1-3) filed by Philip Burgess, LJP Consulting, LLC, Microbilt Financial Services Corporation, Alonzo Primus, Princeton Alternative Funding, LLC, Princeton Alternative Income Fund, L.P., Walter Wojciechowski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D, with Index, #2 Exhibit E-F, #3 Exhibit G-J)(Durrette, Wyatt)
December 8, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Sanctions Against Plaintiffs' Counsel Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11(b)(1-3) by Philip Burgess, LJP Consulting, LLC, Microbilt Financial Services Corporation, Alonzo Primus, Princeton Alternative Funding, LLC, Princeton Alternative Income Fund, L.P., Walter Wojciechowski. (Durrette, Wyatt)
December 1, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Michael Gomez, Philip Gomez, John Doe Nos. 1-15, Chris McCloud, Vivian McCloud, filed by Judith Harrison, Lashell Epperson, Steven Mann, Kevin Williams.(Kelly, Kristi)
December 1, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice As to Defendants Princeton Alternative Funding, LLC, Princeton Alternative Income Fund, L.P., Philip Burgess, Alonzo Primus, Walter Wojciechowski, Microbilt Financial Services Corporation, and LJP Consulting, LLC by Lashell Epperson, Judith Harrison, Steven Mann, Kevin Williams (Bennett, Leonard)
November 24, 2020 Filing 12 Certificate of Compliance as to Michael Gomez, Chris McCloud, Vivian McCloud served on 11/24/2020, answer due 12/15/2020. (smej, )
November 23, 2020 Filing 11 Certificate of Compliance as to Philip Gomez served on 11/23/2020, answer due 12/14/2020. (smej, )
November 16, 2020 Notice of Corrections re #9 Waiver of Service Executed, #8 Waiver of Service Executed, #7 Waiver of Service Executed, #10 Waiver of Service Executed, #6 Waiver of Service Executed, #4 Waiver of Service Executed, #5 Waiver of Service Executed. The text has been modified to reflect the correct party/filer of the documents. (tjoh, )
November 12, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Walter Wojciechowski waiver sent on 11/10/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. (Kelly, Kristi) Modified on 11/16/2020 to correct text (tjoh, ).
November 12, 2020 Filing 9 DUPLICATE ENTRY OF #8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Princeton Alternative Income Fund, L.P. waiver sent on 11/10/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. (Kelly, Kristi) Modified on 11/16/2020 to correct text(tjoh, ).
November 12, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Princeton Alternative Funding, LLC waiver sent on 11/10/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. (Kelly, Kristi) Modified on 11/16/2020 to correct text(tjoh, ).
November 12, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Philip Burgess waiver sent on 11/10/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. (Kelly, Kristi) Modified on 11/16/2020 to correct text (tjoh, ).
November 12, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Microbilt Financial Services Corporation waiver sent on 11/10/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. (Kelly, Kristi) Modified on 11/16/2020 to correct text (tjoh, ).
November 12, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed LJP Consulting, LLC waiver sent on 11/10/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. (Kelly, Kristi) Modified on 11/16/2020 to correct text(tjoh, ).
November 12, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Alonzo Primus waiver sent on 11/10/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. (Kelly, Kristi) Modified on 11/16/2020 to correct text(tjoh, ).
October 22, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Philip Burgess, Michael Gomez, Philip Gomez, LJP Consulting, LLC, Chris McCloud, Vivian McCloud, Microbilt Financial Services Corporation, Alonzo Primus, Princeton Alternative Funding, LLC, Princeton Alternative Income Fund, L.P., Walter Wojciechowski. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (smej, )
October 22, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Robert E. Payne. (smej, )
October 21, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons for All Defendants by Lashell Epperson, Judith Harrison, Steven Mann, Kevin Williams. (Attachments: #1 Supplement A. Primus, #2 Supplement C. McCloud, #3 Supplement LJP Consulting, #4 Supplement M. Gomez, #5 Supplement Microbilt, #6 Supplement P. Gomez, #7 Supplement P. Burgess, #8 Supplement Princeton Alt. Income Fund, #9 Supplement V. McCloud, #10 Supplement W. Wojciechowski) (Kelly, Kristi)
October 21, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint (Filing Fee: $400.00, Receipt Number: 0422-7456878), filed by Judith Harrison, Lashell Epperson, Steven Mann, Kevin Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kelly, Kristi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mann et al v. Gomez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Nos. 1-15
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alonzo Primus
Represented By: Wyatt B. Durrette, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris McCloud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Burgess
Represented By: Wyatt B. Durrette, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microbilt Financial Services Corporation
Represented By: Wyatt B. Durrette, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivian McCloud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Princeton Alternative Income Fund, L.P.
Represented By: Wyatt B. Durrette, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LJP Consulting, LLC
Represented By: Wyatt B. Durrette, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Princeton Alternative Funding, LLC
Represented By: Wyatt B. Durrette, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Wojciechowski
Represented By: Wyatt B. Durrette, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lashell Epperson
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Leonard Anthony Bennett
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Williams
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Leonard Anthony Bennett
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Harrison
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Leonard Anthony Bennett
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Mann
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Leonard Anthony Bennett
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?