Medical Mutual Insurance Company of North Carolina v. Littaua, et al.
Plaintiff: Medical Mutual Insurance Company of North Carolina
Defendant: Rebecca Alejandrino Littaua, Tri-Cities Infectious Disease Associates, P.C. and Kyung Chun Yeon
Case Number: 3:2020cv00822
Filed: October 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2020 Filing 19 Joint Discovery Plan by Medical Mutual Insurance Company of North Carolina.(Howell, Danny)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER with Attachment #1 Pretrial Schedule A - Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2021 at 10:15 AM before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (Order issued by deputy clerk at the direction of the Court) (rpiz)
December 9, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY in Support re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Partial Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Kyung Chun Yeon (McNew, Edward). Modified docket text on 12/10/2020. (sbea,)
December 9, 2020 Notice of Correction re: #14 and #15 Affidavit of Service; Filing attorney entered the wrong service date; 12/1/2020 and the correct date is 11/19/2020. Clerk will correct the answer due date to reflect 12/10/2020. (sbea,)
December 9, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Jackson Martin, IV on behalf of Medical Mutual Insurance Company of North Carolina (Martin, Robert)
December 8, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on REBECCA ALEJANDRINO LITTAUA, on 11/19/2020, filed by Medical Mutual Insurance Company of North Carolina (Howell, Danny). Modified docket text on 12/9/2020. (sbea,)
December 8, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on TRI-CITIES INFECTIOUS DISEASE on 11/19/2020, filed by Medical Mutual Insurance Company of North Carolina (Howell, Danny). Modified to correct docket text on 12/9/2020. (sbea,)
December 8, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Rebecca Alejandrino Littaua, Tri-Cities Infectious Disease Associates, P.C..(Williamson, Thomas)
December 7, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Winfield Williamson, Jr on behalf of Rebecca Alejandrino Littaua, Tri-Cities Infectious Disease Associates, P.C. (Williamson, Thomas)
December 4, 2020 Filing 11 Memorandum in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Partial Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Medical Mutual Insurance Company of North Carolina. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Howell, Danny)
November 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Bryan Slaughter on behalf of Kyung Chun Yeon (Slaughter, Michael)
November 20, 2020 Filing 9 Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Partial Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Kyung Chun Yeon. (McNew, Edward)
November 20, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Partial Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Kyung Chun Yeon. (McNew, Edward)
November 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Kyle McNew on behalf of Kyung Chun Yeon (McNew, Edward)
October 28, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Medical Mutual Insurance Company of North Carolina. Kyung Chun Yeon waiver sent on 10/27/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Howell, Danny)
October 22, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Rebecca Alejandrino Littaua and Tri-Cities Infectious Disease Associates, P.C. **NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (sbea,)
October 22, 2020 Notice of Correction re: #1 Complaint, #2 Financial Disclosure Statement; Clerk added Civil Action Numbers to the Complaint and Financial Interest Disclosure Statement. NEFs were regenerated. Proposed Summons was not submitted for defendant, Kyung Chun Yeon. In the future filing attorney should include the Civil Action Number on documents submitted to the court. (sbea,)
October 22, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (sbea,)
October 22, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons by Medical Mutual Insurance Company of North Carolina. (Howell, Danny)
October 22, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons by Medical Mutual Insurance Company of North Carolina. (Howell, Danny)
October 22, 2020 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Medical Mutual Insurance Company of North Carolina. (Howell, Danny). Clerk replaced Financial Disclosure Statement to include Civil Action Number on 10/22/2020. NEF was regenerated. Modified docket text on 10/22/2020. (sbea,)
October 22, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint (Filing Fee: $400, Receipt Number: 0422-7459443), filed by Medical Mutual Insurance Company of North Carolina. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Howell, Danny). Clerk replaced complaint to include Civil Action Number on 10/22/2020. NEF was regenerated. Modified docket text on 10/22/2020. (sbea,)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medical Mutual Insurance Company of North Carolina v. Littaua, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Alejandrino Littaua
Represented By: Thomas Winfield Williamson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tri-Cities Infectious Disease Associates, P.C.
Represented By: Thomas Winfield Williamson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyung Chun Yeon
Represented By: Edward Kyle McNew
Represented By: Michael Bryan Slaughter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medical Mutual Insurance Company of North Carolina
Represented By: Danny Mark Howell
Represented By: Robert Jackson Martin, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?