Smith v. C.R. Bard, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Paul L. Smith
Defendant: C R Bard Inc and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00824
Filed: October 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: M Hannah Lauck
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Notification of transfer of case from the Eastern District of PA Case No. 2:20cv5169 to the Eastern District of Virginia. (ldab, )
October 22, 2020 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-05169. Original file and docket sheet received.
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE PARTIES JOINT MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE (ECF NO. 3), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF THE COURT IS DIRECTED TO TRANSFER THIS CASE IMMEDIATELY TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF VIRGINIA. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 10/21/2020.10/21/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/22/2020.]
October 20, 2020 Filing 3 Joint MOTION to Transfer filed by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C. R. BARD, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SMITH, KEITH) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/22/2020.]
October 16, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C. R. BARD, INC..(FEENEY, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/22/2020.]
October 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C. R. BARD, INC. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14644813), filed by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C. R. BARD, INC..(FEENEY, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/22/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. C.R. Bard, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Inc
Represented By: Keith E. Smith
Represented By: Brian T. Feeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Keith E. Smith
Represented By: Brian T. Feeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul L. Smith
Represented By: Charles E. Soechting, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?