Davis v. Henrico County Jail West et al
Plaintiff: Barry Thomas Davis
Defendant: Henrico Jail Mental Health Contractor, Henrico County Jail West and Henrico Jail Medical Contractor(s) 2018-2020
Case Number: 3:2020cv00883
Filed: November 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth W Hanes
Referring Judge: David J Novak
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2021 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Henrico Regional Jail East as to Barry Thomas Davis. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Account). (sbea,)
January 7, 2021 Filing 5 Consent to Collection of Fees by Barry Thomas Davis re: #3 Memorandum Order. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Attachment - Pages 1-6, #3 Attachment - Pages 7-13, #4 Attachment - Pages 14-43 (Received 01-11-2021), #5 Attachments, #6 Envelope #1, #7 Envelope #2, #8 Envelope #3) (walk, ). Modified docket entry on 01/11/2021 and regenerated NEF. (walk, ).
December 31, 2020 Filing 4 Letter RECEIVED by Barry Thomas Davis re: Access to the Courts Code Sections of Civil Law. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Request Form, #2 Letter to Judge Harris, #3 Envelope). (sbea,)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM ORDER that this action is CONDITIONALLY docketed; Plaintiff to submit statement as set out herein within 30 days of entry hereof; Clerk to obtain certified copy of Plaintiff's trust fund account for 6 month period immediately preceding the initiation of this action; Plaintiff to return the Consent to Collection of Fees form within thirty (30) days of entry hereof. See Order for details. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes on 12/11/2020. Memorandum order was mailed to the plaintiff. (sbea,)
November 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Barry Thomas Davis. (sbea,)
November 18, 2020 Filing 1 Prisoner COMPLAINT against Henrico County Jail West, Henrico Jail Medical Contractor(s) 2018-2020, Henrico Jail Mental Health Contractor, filed by Barry Thomas Davis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tjoh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Henrico County Jail West et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henrico Jail Mental Health Contractor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henrico County Jail West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henrico Jail Medical Contractor(s) 2018-2020
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Thomas Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?