Rosales et al v. Capital Interior Contractors et al
Plaintiff: Gilberto Rosales, Hector Polanco-Alvarez, Marcos Cabrera, Azalea Aguilar, Peyton Rodriguez Lugo, Oscar Acosta, William Alexander Salgado, Abel Bartolon Ramos, Carlos Anibal Bedoya, Carlos Heriberto Benitez Orellana, Jorge Colin-Garfias, Emer Samir Rodriguez Avila, Ramon Antonio Mejia Costello, Nolberto Bueso, Cristian Romero, Chelston Juarez, Luis Manuel Brene, Franklin Rolando Morazan Isaguirre, Alvin Garcia, Ramon Escalante, Yenyffer Romero, Jose Romero, Jeronimo Chavez, Josue Esteban Morales, Rogelio Antonio Benitez, Oscar Ortez-Nuila, Miguel Villeda and Javier Fernandez
Defendant: Capital Interior Contractors, RDIC Incorporated and GTO Drywall
Case Number: 3:2020cv00916
Filed: December 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15:1938
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2021 Filing 17 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Capital Interior Contractors. (Story, Nathaniel)
January 29, 2021 Filing 16 Memorandum in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Capital Interior Contractors. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Story, Nathaniel)
January 29, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Capital Interior Contractors. (Story, Nathaniel)
December 23, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Consent to Join Suit as a Party Plaintiff by Rachel Emily Nadas on behalf of Hector Polanco-Alvarez, Gilberto Rosales (Attachments: #1 Consents to Join, #2 Consents to Join)(Nadas, Rachel)
December 17, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Reissued as to Capital Interior Contractors, GTO Drywall, RDIC Incorporated. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically reissued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the Amended Complaint. (asho, )
December 16, 2020 Filing 12 Proposed Summons by Hector Polanco-Alvarez, Gilberto Rosales. (Nadas, Rachel)
December 16, 2020 Filing 11 Proposed Summons by Hector Polanco-Alvarez, Gilberto Rosales. (Nadas, Rachel)
December 16, 2020 Filing 10 Proposed Summons by Hector Polanco-Alvarez, Gilberto Rosales. (Nadas, Rachel)
December 16, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Gilberto Rosales, Hector Polanco-Alvarez.(Nadas, Rachel)
December 8, 2020 Notice of Correction re #7 NOTICE OF ERRATA. The filing user is notified to file an Amended Complaint with the party correction and new proposed summonses for all defendants that the Clerk will re-issue. (tjoh, )
December 2, 2020 Filing 8 Proposed Summons by Hector Polanco-Alvarez, Gilberto Rosales. (Nadas, Rachel)
December 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Hector Polanco-Alvarez, Gilberto Rosales (Nadas, Rachel)
December 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Bryce Kaplan on behalf of Hector Polanco-Alvarez, Gilberto Rosales (Kaplan, Matthew)
December 2, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Capital Interior Contractors, GTO Drywall, RDIC Incorporated. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Remove header and print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (tjoh, )
December 2, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (tjoh, )
December 1, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons by Hector Polanco-Alvarez, Gilberto Rosales. (Nadas, Rachel)
December 1, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons by Hector Polanco-Alvarez, Gilberto Rosales. (Nadas, Rachel)
December 1, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Hector Polanco-Alvarez, Gilberto Rosales. (Nadas, Rachel)
December 1, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0422-7521000.), filed by Gilberto Rosales, Hector Polanco-Alvarez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Consent to Join, #3 Consent to Join)(Nadas, Rachel) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/2/2020) (tjoh, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosales et al v. Capital Interior Contractors et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilberto Rosales
Represented By: Rachel Emily Nadas
Represented By: Matthew Bryce Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Polanco-Alvarez
Represented By: Rachel Emily Nadas
Represented By: Matthew Bryce Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcos Cabrera
Represented By: Matthew Bryce Kaplan
Represented By: Rachel Emily Nadas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Azalea Aguilar
Represented By: Matthew Bryce Kaplan
Represented By: Rachel Emily Nadas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peyton Rodriguez Lugo
Represented By: Matthew Bryce Kaplan
Represented By: Rachel Emily Nadas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Acosta
Represented By: Matthew Bryce Kaplan
Represented By: Rachel Emily Nadas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Alexander Salgado
Represented By: Matthew Bryce Kaplan
Represented By: Rachel Emily Nadas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abel Bartolon Ramos
Represented By: Matthew Bryce Kaplan
Represented By: Rachel Emily Nadas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Anibal Bedoya
Represented By: Matthew Bryce Kaplan
Represented By: Rachel Emily Nadas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Heriberto Benitez Orellana
Represented By: Matthew Bryce Kaplan
Represented By: Rachel Emily Nadas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Colin-Garfias
Represented By: Matthew Bryce Kaplan
Represented By: Rachel Emily Nadas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emer Samir Rodriguez Avila
Represented By: Matthew Bryce Kaplan
Represented By: Rachel Emily Nadas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Antonio Mejia Costello
Represented By: Matthew Bryce Kaplan
Represented By: Rachel Emily Nadas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nolberto Bueso
Represented By: Matthew Bryce Kaplan
Represented By: Rachel Emily Nadas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristian Romero
Represented By: Matthew Bryce Kaplan
Represented By: Rachel Emily Nadas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelston Juarez
Represented By: Matthew Bryce Kaplan
Represented By: Rachel Emily Nadas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Manuel Brene
Represented By: Matthew Bryce Kaplan
Represented By: Rachel Emily Nadas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin Rolando Morazan Isaguirre
Represented By: Matthew Bryce Kaplan
Represented By: Rachel Emily Nadas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin Garcia
Represented By: Matthew Bryce Kaplan
Represented By: Rachel Emily Nadas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Escalante
Represented By: Matthew Bryce Kaplan
Represented By: Rachel Emily Nadas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yenyffer Romero
Represented By: Matthew Bryce Kaplan
Represented By: Rachel Emily Nadas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Romero
Represented By: Matthew Bryce Kaplan
Represented By: Rachel Emily Nadas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeronimo Chavez
Represented By: Matthew Bryce Kaplan
Represented By: Rachel Emily Nadas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josue Esteban Morales
Represented By: Matthew Bryce Kaplan
Represented By: Rachel Emily Nadas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rogelio Antonio Benitez
Represented By: Matthew Bryce Kaplan
Represented By: Rachel Emily Nadas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Ortez-Nuila
Represented By: Matthew Bryce Kaplan
Represented By: Rachel Emily Nadas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Villeda
Represented By: Matthew Bryce Kaplan
Represented By: Rachel Emily Nadas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Fernandez
Represented By: Matthew Bryce Kaplan
Represented By: Rachel Emily Nadas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Interior Contractors
Represented By: Nathaniel Lyle Story
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RDIC Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GTO Drywall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?