Mereacre v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Artur Mereacre
Respondent: Chad Wolf, Tony Pham, Warden of ICA Farmville Immigration Detention Facility, William Barr and Matthew Munroe
Case Number: 3:2020cv00922
Filed: December 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John A Gibney
Referring Judge: Elizabeth W Hanes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Immigration Centers of America Farmville as to Artur Mereacre. (walk, )
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM ORDER (Conditionally Filing 28 U.S.C. 2241 Petition and Requiring Petitioner to Complete the Standardized Form) - The petition is CONDITIONALLY FILED; Petitioner is DIRECTED to complete and return the form to the Court within eleven (11) days of the date of entry hereof. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Petitioner a Notice & Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate form. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes on 12/23/2020. (Copy of Memorandum Order, 2241 Form, IFP Form, & Notice and Consent Form mailed to Petitioner. Inmate Account Form and copy of Memorandum Order mailed to Plaintiff's Institution.) (smej, )
December 2, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Artur Mereacre. (Additional attachment added on 12/2/2020: #1 Receipt in the amount of $5.00). Modified docket text on 12/2/2020. (sbea,)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mereacre v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tony Pham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden of ICA Farmville Immigration Detention Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew Munroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Artur Mereacre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?