Goldberg v. Kone et al
Plaintiff: Benjemin S Goldberg
Defendant: Russell Woodlief, Cameron Shaffer, Paula Krueger and Michael Kone
Case Number: 3:2021cv00100
Filed: February 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2021 Notice of Correction re #7 Summons Returned Executed: Filing attorney notified of proper filing procedures for service documents. (smej, )
April 16, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Michael Kone served on 4/5/2021, answer due 4/26/2021; Paula Krueger served on 4/5/2021, answer due 4/26/2021; Cameron Shaffer served on 4/5/2021, answer due 4/26/2021; Russell Woodlief served on 4/5/2021, answer due 4/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Letter) (smej, )
March 16, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Michael Kone, Paula Krueger, Cameron Shaffer, Russell Woodlief. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (smej, )
March 15, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Summons for Defendant Shaffer by Benjemin S Goldberg. (Harvill, Daniel)
March 15, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons for Defendant Woodlief by Benjemin S Goldberg. (Harvill, Daniel)
March 15, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons for Defendant Krueger by Benjemin S Goldberg. (Harvill, Daniel)
March 15, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons for Defendant Kone by Benjemin S Goldberg. (Harvill, Daniel)
February 22, 2021 Notice of Correction re #1 Complaint: Filing attorney has been instructed to file proposed summons to serve defendants, or if waiving service, to notify the court in writing by electronically filing the notice. (smej, )
February 19, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint (Filing Fee: $402.00, Receipt Number: 0422-7635770), filed by Benjemin S Goldberg. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Harvill, Daniel)
February 19, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (smej, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldberg v. Kone et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Woodlief
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Krueger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Kone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjemin S Goldberg
Represented By: Daniel Augustine Harvill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?