Sandys v. Willard et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Sandys and Maria Cecilia Lorca
Defendant: Juul Labs, Inc., Kevin Burns, Altria Group Inc., Howard A. Willard, III, Riaz Valani, Nicholas J. Pritzker, Kevin C. Crosthwaite and William F. Gifford, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00198
Filed: March 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Office: Richmond Office
Presiding Judge: David J Novak
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER (Granting Motion to Consolidate Related Actions). The Joint #79 Motion to Consolidate Related Shareholder Derivative Actions and Set Briefing Schedule for the Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel is hereby GRANTED. See Order for complete details and deadlines. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 4/14/2021. (sbea,)
April 12, 2021 Filing 79 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Altria Group Inc., Kevin Burns, Kevin C. Crosthwaite, William F. Gifford, Jr, Juul Labs, Inc., Nicholas J. Pritzker, Riaz Valani, Howard A. Willard, III. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(Schronce, Johnathon)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDERS granting #75 , #76 , and #77 Motions for Pro hac vice. Melanie Craig MacKay, Andrew Joshua Levander, and Jeffrey Alan Brown appointed for William F. Gifford, Jr. and Howard A. Willard, III. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 4/6/2021. (jsmi, )
April 2, 2021 Filing 77 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Melanie Craig MacKay and Certification of Local Counsel Rani Habash Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7705385. by William F. Gifford, Jr, Howard A. Willard, III. (Habash, Rani)
April 2, 2021 Filing 76 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey Alan Brown and Certification of Local Counsel Rani Habash Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7705375. by William F. Gifford, Jr, Howard A. Willard, III. (Habash, Rani)
April 2, 2021 Filing 75 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew Joshua Levander and Certification of Local Counsel Rani Habash Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7705351. by William F. Gifford, Jr, Howard A. Willard, III. (Habash, Rani)
April 2, 2021 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Rani Afif Habash on behalf of William F. Gifford, Jr, Howard A. Willard, III (Habash, Rani)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER that the Court GRANTS Defendants' #71 Motion to Withdraw Appearance, moving to withdraw Benjamin Klein, Esq., as counsel of record for Defendants and DIRECTS the Clerk to terminate the attorney as counsel of record in this matter. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 4/2/2021. (jsmi, )
March 31, 2021 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Johnathon Earl Schronce on behalf of Altria Group Inc. (Schronce, Johnathon)
March 31, 2021 Filing 71 MOTION to Withdraw Appearance of Benjamin Klein by Altria Group Inc.. (Fuhr, Edward)
March 31, 2021 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Joseph Fuhr on behalf of Altria Group Inc. (Fuhr, Edward)
March 24, 2021 Filing 69 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 4:20-cv-05480. Original file and docket sheet received.
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER GRANTING #46 MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE, GRANTING #51 MOTION TO TRANSFER TO THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF VIRGINIA'S RICHMOND DIVISION, DENYING #46 MOTION TO APPOINT LEAD PLAINTIFF, AND DENYING #51 MOTION TO STAY by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
March 22, 2021 Case electronically transferred to the U.S. District Court, Eastern District of Virginia - Richmond Division. Counsel notified (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
March 19, 2021 Filing 67 NOTICE OF RESPONSE TO ECF NO. 66 RE NEW FACT DEVELOPMENTS RELEVANT TO ALTRIA DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER OR STAY, ECF 51, filed by Altria Group, Inc., Kevin C. Crosthwaite, William F. Gifford, Jr, Howard A. Willard, III re #66 Notice, #51 MOTION to Transfer Case or Stay and Opposition to Plaintiff's Leadership Request (Wulfe, Lauren) (Filed on 3/19/2021) Modified on 3/22/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
March 16, 2021 Filing 66 NOTICE Re: New Fact Developments Relevant to Motion to Transfer or Stay by Maria Cecilia Lorca, Thomas Sandys re #62 Opposition/Response to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1, #2 Ex. 2, #3 Ex. 3, #4 Ex. 4)(Smith, Craig) (Filed on 3/16/2021) Modified on 3/16/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
December 18, 2020 Filing 65 REPLY (re #51 MOTION to Transfer Case or Stay and Opposition to Plaintiff's Leadership Request, #56 MOTION to Consolidate Cases ) filed byAltria Group, Inc., Kevin C. Crosthwaite, William F. Gifford, Jr, Howard A. Willard, III. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kevin Crosthwaite, Jr.)(Wulfe, Lauren) (Filed on 12/18/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
December 14, 2020 Filing 64 NOTICE Re: New Fact Developments Relevant to Motion to Transfer or Stay by Maria Cecilia Lorca, Thomas Sandys re #62 Opposition/Response to Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Craig) (Filed on 12/14/2020) Modified on 12/15/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
December 10, 2020 Filing 63 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION HEARING. You are hereby notified that the hearing re #56 Motion to Consolidate Cases and Appoint Plaintiffs Co-Lead Counsel is VACATED. The matter is taken under submission on the papers. In the event that the court determines that oral argument is necessary, the court will issue a notice to the parties with instructions on the hearing procedure at a future date. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
December 4, 2020 Filing 62 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #51 MOTION to Transfer Case or Stay and Opposition to Plaintiff's Leadership Request ) filed byMaria Cecilia Lorca, Thomas Sandys. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Craig W. Smith)(Smith, Craig) (Filed on 12/4/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
November 25, 2020 Filing 61 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION HEARING. You are hereby notified that the hearing re #51 Motion to Transfer Case or Stay is VACATED. The matter will be taken under submission on the papers. In the event that the court determines that oral argument is necessary, the court will issue a notice to the parties with instructions on the hearing procedure at a future date. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ADJOURN CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND EXTEND TIME by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #59 Stipulation. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
November 25, 2020 Reset Deadlines as to #51 MOTION to Transfer Case or Stay. Response due by 12/4/2020. Reply due by 12/18/2020. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
November 24, 2020 Filing 59 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO ADJOURN CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND TO EXTEND TIME, filed by Altria Group, Inc., Kevin Burns, Kevin C. Crosthwaite, William F. Gifford, Jr, Juul Labs, Inc., Maria Cecilia Lorca, Nicholas J. Pritzker, Thomas Sandys, Riaz Valani, Howard A. Willard, III (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Craig W. Smith, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Smith, Craig) (Filed on 11/24/2020) Modified on 11/25/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
November 23, 2020 Filing 58 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION HEARING. You are hereby notified that the hearing re #46 Motion Consolidate Cases and Appoint Plaintiffs' Co-Lead Counsel is VACATED. The matter is taken under submission on the papers. In the event that the court determines that oral argument is necessary, the court will issue a notice to the parties with instructions on the hearing procedure at a future date. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
November 17, 2020 Filing 57 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #56 MOTION to Consolidate Cases ) filed byAltria Group, Inc., Kevin C. Crosthwaite, William F. Gifford, Jr, Howard A. Willard, III. (Wulfe, Lauren) (Filed on 11/17/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
November 17, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] The correct event is Joinder. The correct event can be found at: Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Joinder. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #54 MOTION for Joinder Of Defendants Juul Labs, Inc., And Kevin Burns To The Altria Defendants Motion To Transfer Or Stay And Opposition To Plaintiffs Leadership Request filed by Juul Labs, Inc., Kevin Burns (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
November 16, 2020 Filing 56 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Appoint Plaintiffs' Co-Lead Counsel filed by Maria Cecilia Lorca, Thomas Sandys and Altria Group, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/23/2020 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 11/30/2020. Replies due by 12/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Craig W. Smith, #2 Declaration of Jing-Li Yu, #3 Proposed Order)(Smith, Craig) (Filed on 11/16/2020) Modified on 11/17/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER RELATING CASE. Case C-20-5480-PJH is relate to case C-20-6041-RS. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/16/2020. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
November 16, 2020 Filing 54 Notice of Joinder Of Defendants Juul Labs, Inc., And Kevin Burns To The Altria Defendants Motion To Transfer Or Stay And Opposition To Plaintiffs Leadership Request filed by Kevin Burns, Juul Labs, Inc.. (Klar, Austin) (Filed on 11/16/2020) Modified on 11/17/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
November 13, 2020 Filing 53 ERRATA re #51 MOTION to Transfer Case or Stay and Opposition to Plaintiff's Leadership Request by Altria Group, Inc., Kevin C. Crosthwaite, William F. Gifford, Jr, Howard A. Willard, III. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Motion to Transfer or Stay and Opposition to Plaintiffs Leadership Request)(Wulfe, Lauren) (Filed on 11/13/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
November 10, 2020 Filing 52 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #46 MOTION to Consolidate Cases C-20-6041-RS and Appoint Plaintiffs' Co-Lead Counsel ) filed byAltria Group, Inc., Kevin C. Crosthwaite, William F. Gifford, Jr, Howard A. Willard, III. (Wulfe, Lauren) (Filed on 11/10/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
November 10, 2020 Filing 51 MOTION to Transfer Case or Stay and Opposition to Plaintiff's Leadership Request filed by Altria Group, Inc., Kevin C. Crosthwaite, William F. Gifford, Jr, Howard A. Willard, III. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2020 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 11/24/2020. Replies due by 12/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Wulfe, Lauren) (Filed on 11/10/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #49 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jing-Li Yu. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
November 4, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Jing-Li Yu ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15151585.) filed by Thomas Sandys. (Yu, Jing-Li) (Filed on 11/4/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
October 29, 2020 Filing 48 STIPULATION REGARDING ADMINISTRATIVE MMOTION TO RELATE CASES AND PROPOSED ORDER re #47 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related re 3:20-cv-06041-RS. filed by Thomas Sandys, Altria Group, Inc., Kevin Burns, Kevin C. Crosthwaite, William F. Gifford, Jr., Juul Labs, Inc., Maria Cecilia Lorca, Nicholas J. Pritzker, Riaz Valani, Howard A. Williard, III. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 10/29/2020) Modified on 10/30/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
October 29, 2020 Filing 47 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related re 3:20-cv-06041-RS, filed by Thomas Sandys. Responses due by 11/4/2020. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 10/29/2020) Modified on 10/30/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
October 28, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect PDF attached. [err201] NOTICE TO COUNSEL: That before a Motion to Consolidate can be filed the cases have to first be related by Court Order; Please file an Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related, pursuant to Civ.L.R. 3-12(b). Please re-file in its entirety, into the earliest filed case re #46 MOTION to Consolidate Cases C-20-6041-RS and Appoint Plaintiffs' Co-Lead Counsel filed by Maria Cecilia Lorca, Thomas Sandys (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
October 27, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION to Consolidate Cases C-20-6041-RS and Appoint Plaintiffs' Co-Lead Counsel, filed by Thomas Sandys, Maria Cecilia Lorca. Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2020 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 11/10/2020. Replies due by 11/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Craig W. Smith, #2 Declaration of Jing-Li Yu, #3 Proposed Order)(Smith, Craig) (Filed on 10/27/2020) Modified on 10/28/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
October 23, 2020 Filing 45 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Thomas Sandys. Service waived by Riaz Valani waiver sent on 10/2/2020, answer due 12/1/2020. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 10/23/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
October 23, 2020 Filing 44 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Thomas Sandys. Service waived by Nicholas J. Pritzker waiver sent on 10/2/2020, answer due 12/1/2020. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 10/23/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
October 19, 2020 Filing 43 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Thomas Sandys. Service waived by Kevin Burns waiver sent on 10/2/2020, answer due 12/1/2020. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 10/19/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
October 19, 2020 Filing 42 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Thomas Sandys. Service waived by William F. Gifford, Jr waiver sent on 8/24/2020, answer due 10/23/2020. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 10/19/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
October 19, 2020 Filing 41 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Thomas Sandys. Service waived by Howard A. Willard, III waiver sent on 8/24/2020, answer due 10/23/2020. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 10/19/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #36 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Matthew J. Peters. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #35 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Susan E. Engel. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #34 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Andrew Clubok. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
September 25, 2020 Filing 37 Certificate of Interested Entities by Kevin C. Crosthwaite (Murphy, Kristin) (Filed on 9/25/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
September 25, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Matthew J. Peters (Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14989820.) filed by Kevin C. Crosthwaite. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Peters, Matthew) (Filed on 9/25/2020) Modified on 9/28/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
September 25, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Susan E. Engel (Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14989727.) filed by Kevin C. Crosthwaite. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Engel, Susan) (Filed on 9/25/2020) Modified on 9/28/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
September 25, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Andrew Clubok (Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14989642.) filed by Kevin C. Crosthwaite. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Clubok, Andrew) (Filed on 9/25/2020) Modified on 9/28/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
September 25, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance of Andrew Brian Clubok as Counsel, filed by Kevin C. Crosthwaite (Clubok, Andrew) (Filed on 9/25/2020) Modified on 9/28/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
September 25, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance of Kristin Nicole Murphy as Counsel, filed by Kevin C. Crosthwaite (Murphy, Kristin) (Filed on 9/25/2020) Modified on 9/28/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
September 24, 2020 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Thomas Sandys. Service waived by Kevin C. Crosthwaite waiver sent on 9/2/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 9/24/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Joshua Rabinovitz. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Benjamin D. Klein. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Stephen R. DiPrima. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/10/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2020 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/17/2020. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Signed by the Clerk on 9/16/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
September 15, 2020 Filing 25 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Joshua Rabinovitz (Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14931083) filed by Juul Labs, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert. of Good Standing)(Rabinovitz, Joshua) (Filed on 9/11/2020) Modified on 9/14/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 23 Certificate of Interested Entities by Juul Labs, Inc. (Klar, Austin) (Filed on 9/11/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 22 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Juul Labs, Inc. (Klar, Austin) (Filed on 9/11/2020) Modified on 9/14/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Austin L. Klar on Behalf of Juul Labs, Inc. (Klar, Austin) (Filed on 9/11/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 20 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Altria Group, Inc... (Wulfe, Lauren) (Filed on 9/11/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Entities by Altria Group, Inc. (Wulfe, Lauren) (Filed on 9/11/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Altria Group, Inc. (Wulfe, Lauren) (Filed on 9/11/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Sachi Wulfe (Wulfe, Lauren) (Filed on 9/11/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Benjamin D. Klein ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14929335.) filed by Altria Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Klein, Benjamin) (Filed on 9/11/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin D. Klein (Klein, Benjamin) (Filed on 9/11/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Stephen R. DiPrima ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14929125.) filed by Altria Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(DiPrima, Stephen) (Filed on 9/11/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen R DiPrima (DiPrima, Stephen) (Filed on 9/11/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #11 Stipulation. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Aligning Response Dates filed by Thomas Sandys, Juul Labs, Inc., Altria Group, Inc. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 8/28/2020) Modified on 8/31/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 10 ***FILED IN ERROR PER FILER. DUPLICATE OF DOCKET #8*** AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and accompanying documents served on The Altria Group, Inc. on August 17, 2020, filed by Thomas Sandys. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 8/24/2020) Modified on 8/24/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 9 ***FILED IN ERROR PER FILER. DUPLICATE OF DOCKET #7*** AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and accompanying documents served on Juul Labs, Inc. on August 14, 2020, filed by Thomas Sandys. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 8/24/2020) Modified on 8/24/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
August 22, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas Sandys. Altria Group, Inc. served on 8/17/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 8/22/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
August 22, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas Sandys. Juul Labs, Inc. served on 8/14/2020, answer due 9/4/2020. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 8/22/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Thomas Sandys.. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 8/19/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/11/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Altria Group, Inc., Kevin Burns, Kevin C. Crosthwaite, William F. Gifford, Jr, Juul Labs, Inc., Nicholas J. Pritzker, Riaz Valani, Howard A. Willard, III. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
August 7, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/21/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
August 7, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 8/7/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against Altria Group, Inc., Kevin Burns, Kevin C. Crosthwaite, William F. Gifford, Jr, Juul Labs, Inc., Nicholas J. Pritzker, Riaz Valani, Howard A. Willard, III (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14787110). Filed by Thomas Sandys. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 8/7/2020) Modified on 8/10/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/24/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandys v. Willard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juul Labs, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Zev Rabinovitz
Represented By: Austin L. Klar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Burns
Represented By: Eric H. MacMichael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Group Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin David Klein
Represented By: Lauren Sachi Wulfe
Represented By: Stephen Richard DiPrima
Represented By: Edward Joseph Fuhr
Represented By: Johnathon Earl Schronce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard A. Willard, III
Represented By: Joshua David Nelson Hess
Represented By: Andrew Joshua Levander
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Brown
Represented By: Rani Afif Habash
Represented By: Melanie MacKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riaz Valani
Represented By: Karl David Belgum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas J. Pritzker
Represented By: Karl David Belgum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin C. Crosthwaite
Represented By: Kristin Nicole Murphy
Represented By: Susan E. Engel
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Matthew J. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William F. Gifford, Jr.
Represented By: Joshua David Nelson Hess
Represented By: Andrew Joshua Levander
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Brown
Represented By: Rani Afif Habash
Represented By: Melanie MacKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Sandys
Represented By: John T. Jasnoch
Represented By: Jing-Li Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Cecilia Lorca
Represented By: Craig Wallace Smith
Represented By: Brian J. Robbins
Represented By: Emily R. Bishop
Represented By: Shane Palmesano Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?