Joyner-Harris v. Saul
Plaintiff: Shanell Denise Joyner-Harris
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Case Number: 3:2021cv00270
Filed: April 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: M Hannah Lauck
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 6/19/2020. (smej, )
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 7/20/2018. (smej, )
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REVISED STANDING ORDER IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 10/17/2013. (smej, )
May 4, 2021 Filing 7 Certificate Reporting Service by Andrew M. Saul, SSA (Social Security Administration). Andrew M. Saul served on 4/26/2021, answer due 6/25/2021; SSA (Social Security Administration) served on 4/26/2021, answer due 6/25/2021. (Lucier, Jonathan)
May 4, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Tyler Lucier on behalf of SSA (Social Security Administration), Andrew M. Saul (Lucier, Jonathan)
April 23, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and sent to USM for service. (tjoh, )
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff may proceed in this case without paying the Courts filing fee. The Clerk is DIRECTED to issue process and deliver the summons to the United States Marshal for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes on 04/23/2021. (tjoh, )
April 22, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shanell Denise Joyner-Harris. (smej, )
April 22, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Shanell Denise Joyner-Harris. (Pollard, Corey)
April 22, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint , filed by Shanell Denise Joyner-Harris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit IFP Motion)(Pollard, Corey)
April 22, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (smej, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joyner-Harris v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Represented By: Jonathan Tyler Lucier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Jonathan Tyler Lucier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shanell Denise Joyner-Harris
Represented By: Corey Reece Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?