Velez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Candido Velez
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Case Number: 3:2021cv00295
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John A Gibney
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 USM Forms, #2 USPS Tracking Information) (smej, )
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 6/19/2020. (smej, )
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 7/20/2018. (smej, )
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REVISED STANDING ORDER IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 10/17/2013. (smej, )
May 17, 2021 Filing 9 Certificate Reporting Service by Commissioner of Social Security. Commissioner of Social Security served on 5/14/2021, answer due 7/13/2021. (Wu, Elizabeth)
May 17, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Catherine Wu on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Wu, Elizabeth)
May 10, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Clerk placed in USM box for service. (Attachments: #1 USM Forms) (smej, )
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - Upon due consideration, Plaintiffs Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. 2) filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a) on May 7, 2021, is GRANTED. Plaintiff may proceed in this case without paying the Courts filing fee. The Clerk is DIRECTED to issue process and deliver the summons to the United States Marshal for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes on 5/10/2021. (smej, )
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Melissa A. Palmer to appear Pro hac vice for Candido Velez. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 5/10/2021. (smej, )
May 10, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr.. (smej, )
May 7, 2021 Filing 4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa A. Palmer and Certification of Local Counsel John O. Goss Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-7777131. by Candido Velez. (Goss, John)
May 7, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Candido Velez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 USM-285 Forms, #4 USM-285 Forms, #5 USM-285 Form)(Goss, John)
May 7, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Candido Velez. (Goss, John)
May 7, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint, filed by Candido Velez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Goss, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Velez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Elizabeth Catherine Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candido Velez
Represented By: John Osborne Goss
Represented By: Melissa A. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?