Zayo Group LLC v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Plaintiff: Zayo Group LLC
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00358
Filed: June 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert E Payne
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2021 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand to Virginia State Corporation Commission filed by Zayo Group LLC. (Brundage, Jeffrey)
July 22, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE by Norfolk Southern Railway Company re #4 MOTION to Transfer Case to Norfolk Division Notice of Submission on the Briefs (Todd, Gordon)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER It is hereby ORDERED that the CONSENT MOTION FOR 7-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO ZAYO'S MOTION TO REMAND (ECF No. #13 ) is granted. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file its response to ZAYO GROUP, LLC'S MOTION TO REMAND (ECF No. #7 ) by July 27, 2021. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 7/20/2021. (asho, )
July 20, 2021 Filing 14 Memorandum in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to Virginia State Corporation Commission filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Malcolm G. Roop)(Todd, Gordon)
July 13, 2021 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Remand to Virginia State Corporation Commission by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Todd, Gordon)
July 12, 2021 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Transfer Case to Norfolk Division filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Todd, Gordon)
July 12, 2021 Filing 11 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Zayo Group LLC. (Brundage, Jeffrey)
July 10, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey P. Brundage on behalf of Zayo Group LLC (Brundage, Jeffrey)
July 6, 2021 Filing 9 Opposition to #4 MOTION to Transfer Case to Norfolk Division filed by Zayo Group LLC. (Brundage, Jeffrey)
July 6, 2021 Filing 8 Memorandum in Support re #7 MOTION to Remand to Virginia State Corporation Commission filed by Zayo Group LLC. (Gastner, Robert)
July 6, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to Virginia State Corporation Commission by Zayo Group LLC. (Gastner, Robert)
July 6, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert James Gastner on behalf of Zayo Group LLC (Gastner, Robert)
June 22, 2021 Filing 5 Memorandum in Support re #4 MOTION to Transfer Case to Norfolk Division filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Todd, Gordon)
June 22, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Transfer Case to Norfolk Division by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Todd, Gordon)
June 17, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Appraisal Panel Decision)(Todd, Gordon)
June 7, 2021 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (asho, )
June 7, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Robert E. Payne. (asho, )
June 4, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-7826852.), filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Todd, Gordon) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/7/2021) (asho, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zayo Group LLC v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zayo Group LLC
Represented By: Eric Michael Page
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Brundage
Represented By: Robert James Gastner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Gordon Dwyer Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?