Goldman v. Northam et al
Plaintiff: Paul Goldman
Defendant: Christopher Piper, Virginia State Board of Elections, Jamilah D LeCruise, Ralph Northam, Jessica Bowman, John O'Bannon and Robert Brink
Case Number: 3:2021cv00420
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: David J Novak
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER (Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time) - For good cause shown, the Court hereby GRANTS IN PART and DENIESIN PART Plaintiff's Motion #14 . The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion to the extent that he requests an extension of time to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. However, the Court will only extend the time to respond by seven (7) days. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 8/18/2021. Copy mailed to plaintiff. (jpow, )
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION - Plaintiff's Motion For An Extension of Time to Response To Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Paul Goldman. (jpow, )
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Memorandum in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. filed by Jessica Bowman, Robert Brink, Jamilah D LeCruise, Ralph Northam, John O'Bannon, Christopher Piper, Virginia State Board of Elections. (Lewis, Carol)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. by Jessica Bowman, Robert Brink, Jamilah D LeCruise, Ralph Northam, John O'Bannon, Christopher Piper, Virginia State Board of Elections. (Lewis, Carol)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Local Rule 83.1(M) Certification received from Paul Goldman (jpow, )
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Calvin Cameron Brown on behalf of Jessica Bowman, Robert Brink, Jamilah D LeCruise, Ralph Northam, John O'Bannon, Christopher Piper, Virginia State Board of Elections (Brown, Calvin)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service re #7 Notice of Appearance by Carol Louise Lewis on behalf of Jessica Bowman, Robert Brink, Jamilah D LeCruise, Ralph Northam, John O'Bannon, Christopher Piper, Virginia State Board of Elections (Lewis, Carol)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany Ashley McGill on behalf of Jessica Bowman, Robert Brink, Jamilah D LeCruise, Ralph Northam, John O'Bannon, Christopher Piper, Virginia State Board of Elections (McGill, Brittany)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Carol Louise Lewis on behalf of Jessica Bowman, Robert Brink, Jamilah D LeCruise, Ralph Northam, John O'Bannon, Christopher Piper, Virginia State Board of Elections (Lewis, Carol)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REISSUED SUMMONSES Returned Executed by Paul Goldman to Jessica Bowman served on 7/13/2021, answer due 8/3/2021; Robert Brink served on 7/13/2021, answer due 8/3/2021; Jamilah D LeCruise served on 7/13/2021, answer due 8/3/2021; Ralph Northam served on 7/13/2021, answer due 8/3/2021; John O'Bannon served on 7/13/2021, answer due 8/3/2021; Christopher Piper served on 7/13/2021, answer due 8/3/2021; and Virginia State Board of Elections served on 7/13/2021, answer due 8/3/2021. (jpow, )
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Reissued as to Jessica Bowman, Robert Brink, Jamilah D LeCruise, Ralph Northam, John O'Bannon, Christopher Piper, and Virginia State Board of Elections. Advised Plaintiff summonses are ready for pick up in the Clerk's Office with a copy of Rule 4. (jpow, )
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Paul Goldman as to Jessica Bowman, Robert Brink, Jamilah D LeCruise, Ralph Northam, John O'Bannon, Christopher Piper, Virginia State Board of Elections. (Advised Plaintiff to return summonses marked unexecuted to have new summonses issued, summonses were returned but not marked unexecuted) (jpow, )
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jessica Bowman, Robert Brink, Jamilah D LeCruise, Ralph Northam, John O'Bannon, Christopher Piper, and Virginia State Board of Elections, filed by Paul Goldman.(jpow, )
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Mailed to Plaintiff with copy of Rule 4. (adun, )
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 34683050825), filed by Paul Goldman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Service Information, #3 Receipt)(adun, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldman v. Northam et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Piper
Represented By: Carol Louise Lewis
Represented By: Brittany Ashley McGill
Represented By: Calvin Cameron Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia State Board of Elections
Represented By: Carol Louise Lewis
Represented By: Brittany Ashley McGill
Represented By: Calvin Cameron Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamilah D LeCruise
Represented By: Carol Louise Lewis
Represented By: Brittany Ashley McGill
Represented By: Calvin Cameron Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Northam
Represented By: Carol Louise Lewis
Represented By: Brittany Ashley McGill
Represented By: Calvin Cameron Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Bowman
Represented By: Carol Louise Lewis
Represented By: Brittany Ashley McGill
Represented By: Calvin Cameron Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John O'Bannon
Represented By: Carol Louise Lewis
Represented By: Brittany Ashley McGill
Represented By: Calvin Cameron Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Brink
Represented By: Carol Louise Lewis
Represented By: Brittany Ashley McGill
Represented By: Calvin Cameron Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?