Page v. Richmond Redevelopment And Housing Authority
Plaintiff: Lafonda Page
Defendant: Richmond Redevelopment And Housing Authority
Case Number: 3:2021cv00462
Filed: July 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re: #20 Reply to Motion; filing attorney selected the wrong filing event. The correct event would be "Response in Opposition to Motion" or "Response to Motion". Clerk has modified the docket text. No further action is required at this time. (sbea,)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Lafonda Page. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hayott, Daryl). Clerk replaced main document and modified Exhibit label name on 9/9/2021. NEF was regenerated. Modified docket text on 9/9/2021. (sbea,)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Response to Motion re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Lafonda Page. (Hayott, Daryl). Clerk replaced document at filing attorney's request on 9/9/2021. NEF was regenerated. Modified docket text on 9/9/2021. (sbea,)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER that the Plaintiff, LaFonda Page's Consent Motion to Replace Exhibits Attached to Verified Complaint, and for good cause shown, Plaintiff's Motion is GRANTED. It is hereby ORDERED that the thirteen Exhibits attached to the Verified Complaint, ECF. No. #1 , shall be replaced with the thirteen Exhibits attached to Plaintiff's Motion. Signed by Senior United States District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 9/1/2021. (sbea,)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CONSENT MOTION TO REPLACE EXHIBITS ATTACHED TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint by Lafonda Page. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order to Replace Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Complaint Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Complaint Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Complaint Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Complaint Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Complaint Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Complaint Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Complaint Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Complaint Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit Complaint Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit Complaint Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit Complaint Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit Complaint Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit Complaint Exhibit 13)(Hayott, Daryl). Modified docket text on 9/1/2021. (sbea,)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that the Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File a reply to the Preliminary Injunction opposition brief, and to file objection to theDefendant's Motion to Dismiss, is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiff LaFonda Page shall have up to and including September 8th, 2021, to make and file its reply to the Preliminary Injunction opposition brief, and to file objection to the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Senior United States District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 8/25/2021. (sbea,)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Lafonda Page. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hayott, Daryl)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by Richmond Redevelopment And Housing Authority.(Gonzalez, Jonathan)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Memorandum in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Richmond Redevelopment And Housing Authority. (Gonzalez, Jonathan)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Memorandum in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Richmond Redevelopment And Housing Authority. (Gonzalez, Jonathan)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Richmond Redevelopment And Housing Authority. (Gonzalez, Jonathan)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan Childers North on behalf of Richmond Redevelopment And Housing Authority (North, Susan)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that Defendant Richmond Redevelopment and Housing Authority's agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings #8 is GRANTED. Defendant Richmond Redevelopment and Housing Authority shall have up to and including August 20, 2021, to file its responsive pleadings to the Complaint and responses to Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 8/10/2021. (adun, )
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Memorandum in Support re #8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings and Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Richmond Redevelopment And Housing Authority. (Gonzalez, Jonathan)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings and Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Richmond Redevelopment And Housing Authority. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gonzalez, Jonathan)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Warren Gonzalez on behalf of Richmond Redevelopment And Housing Authority (Gonzalez, Jonathan)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lafonda Page Richmond Redevelopment And Housing Authority served on 7/22/2021, answer due 8/12/2021 (Attachments: #1 Return of Service)(Hayott, Daryl)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Memorandum in Support re: #4 MOTION for Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief filed by Lafonda Page (Hayott, Daryl). Modified docket text on 7/19/2021. (sbea,)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief by Lafonda Page. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support of PI Motion)(Hayott, Daryl). Modified docket text on 7/19/2021. (sbea,)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re: #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction; The Memorandum in Support is filed as a separate docket entry and not as an attachment. Under the Civil tab, locate Motions and Related Filings; Responses, Replies, and Memorandum; click filing event Memorandum in Support. Please re-file the Memorandum in Support. Please note that it is acceptable to use an electronic signature rather than a "wet signature". (sbea,)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Richmond Redevelopment And Housing Authority. **NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for the Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon the Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (sbea,)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint,, Verified by Lafonda Page. (Hayott, Daryl)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint Verified (Filing Fee: $402, Receipt Number: AVAEDC-7895837), filed by Lafonda Page. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13)(Hayott, Daryl). Clerk replaced Complaint to include Civil Action Number and modified Exhibit label names on 7/16/2021). NEF was regenerated. Modified docket text on 7/16/2021. (sbea,) Clerk replaced page "13" with the consent of Chambers on 8/31/2021. NEF was regenerated. Modified docket text on 8/31/2021 (sbea,). Clerk replaced Exhibits 1-13 as directed by #19 Order filed on September 1, 2021. NEF was regenerated. Modified docket text on 9/1/2021. (sbea,)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (sbea,)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Page v. Richmond Redevelopment And Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lafonda Page
Represented By: Daryl F Hayott
Represented By: Steven Marc Fischbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richmond Redevelopment And Housing Authority
Represented By: Susan Childers North
Represented By: Jonathan Warren Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?