Phillips v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Jerry Bernard Phillips
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Case Number: 3:2021cv00632
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Mark R Colombell
Referring Judge: John A Gibney
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES. See for details. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell on 7/1/2021. (sbea)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES. See for details. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell on 7/1/2021. (sbea)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER. See for details. And it is SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 6/30/2021. (sbea)
November 18, 2021 Filing 5 Certificate Reporting Service by Commissioner of Social Security. Commissioner of Social Security served on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022. (Lucier, Jonathan)
November 18, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Tyler Lucier on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Lucier, Jonathan)
October 1, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to the Commissioner of Social Security, the U.S. Attorney and the U.S. Attorney General. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. Return of Service electronically file using the filing event, Summons Returned Executed as to USA, do not enter a service date. (sbea,)
October 1, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Jerry Bernard Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons)(Goss, John)
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8027400.), filed by Jerry Bernard Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goss, John)
October 1, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell. (sbea,)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Bernard Phillips
Represented By: John Osborne Goss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Jonathan Tyler Lucier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?