Democratic Party of Virginia v. Veal et al
Plaintiff: Democratic Party of Virginia
Defendant: Frank Veal and Gerald Roane
Case Number: 3:2021cv00671
Filed: October 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: M Hannah Lauck
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SO ORDERED STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. In accordance with the Court's October 28 Order (ECF No. #27 ), Plaintiff Democratic Party of Virginia and Defendants Frank Veal and Gerald Roane, in their official capacities, stipulate that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Each party agrees to bear the party's own costs and attorney's fees. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 11/16/2021. (sbea)
November 10, 2021 Filing 29 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Gerald Roane, Frank Veal. (Lucier, Jonathan)
October 29, 2021 Filing 28 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on October 27, 2021, before Judge M. Hannah Lauck, Court Reporter Diane Daffron, Telephone number 804 916-2893. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 11/29/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/29/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/27/2022.(daffron, diane)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 So Ordered re #26 Stipulation filed by Gerald Roane, Frank Veal. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 10/28/21. (khan, )
October 28, 2021 Filing 26 STIPULATION and Proposed Order by Gerald Roane, Frank Veal. (Lucier, Jonathan)
October 28, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Evan Borson on behalf of Gerald Roane, Frank Veal (Borson, Joseph)
October 27, 2021 Filing 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge M. Hannah Lauck:Status Conference held on 10/27/2021 regarding Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction. Parties reached an agreement regarding the TRO and have asked the Court to hold the matter in abeyance until tomorrow, 10/28/21 at 5:00 p.m. to file an Order with the Court. The Court will hold the matter in abeyance until 10/28/21 at 5:00 p.m. (Court Reporter Diane Daffron, OCR.)(khan, )
October 27, 2021 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Support re #8 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Democratic Party of Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Henry J. Brewster, #2 Exhibit Brewster Decl. Ex. A, #3 Exhibit Brewster Decl. Ex. B, #4 Exhibit Brewster Decl. Ex. C, #5 Exhibit Brewster Decl. Ex. D, #6 Exhibit Brewster Decl. Ex. E, #7 Exhibit Brewster Decl. Ex. F, #8 Exhibit Brewster Decl. Ex. G, #9 Exhibit Brewster Decl. Ex. H)(Breit, Jeffrey)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 Motion for John Jerry Robinson to appear as Pro Hac Vice for Frank Veal and Gerald Roane. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 10/27/2021. (sbea)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #14 Motion for David Robert Fox to appear as Pro Hac Vice for the Democratic Party of Virginia. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 10/27/2021. (sbea)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that: 1) Defendant Veal is granted leave and is not required to attend the October 27, 2021 hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction; and, 2) Defendant Gerald Roane and U.S. Postal Service employees Benjamin Farmer III and Dr. Wendy M. McLlwain shall attend on behalf of Defendants. It is SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 10/27/2021. (sbea)
October 26, 2021 Filing 19 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by John J. Robinson and Certification of Local Counsel Jonathan T. Lucier by Gerald Roane, Frank Veal. (Lucier, Jonathan)
October 26, 2021 Filing 18 CONSENT MOTION Leave as to U.S. Postal Service Attendees at October 27th Hearing re: #12 Order by Gerald Roane, Frank Veal. (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Lucier, Jonathan). Modified docket text on 10/27/2021. (sbea)
October 26, 2021 Filing 17 Memorandum in Opposition re #8 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Gerald Roane, Frank Veal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Farmer Declaration), #2 Exhibit 2 (McIlwain Declaration))(Lucier, Jonathan)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Henry Brewster to appear as Pro Hac Vice for the Democratic Party of Virginia. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 10/26/2021. (sbea)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Elisabeth Carmel Frost to appear as Pro Hac Vice for the Democratic Party of Virginia. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 10/26/2021. (sbea)
October 26, 2021 Filing 14 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by David Robert Fox and Certification of Local Counsel Jeffrey Breit Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8069251. by Democratic Party of Virginia. (Breit, Jeffrey)
October 26, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Tyler Lucier on behalf of Gerald Roane, Frank Veal (Lucier, Jonathan)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. On October 22, 2021, Plaintiff Democratic Party of Virginia ("DPVA") filed a Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief (the "Complaint"). On October 25, 2021, the Court conducted a conference call with Plaintiff and Defense Counsel. Shortly thereafter, Plaintiff filed an Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support Thereof (the "Motion"). #8 As stated during the conference call, the Court ORDERS Defendants to file their response to the Motion no later than 4:00 p.m. tomorrow, October 26. 2021. The Court further ORDERS the parties, including Defendants Frank Veal and Gerald Roane, to appear in person for a hearing on the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order on October 27. 2021. at 3:30 p.m. at the Spottswood W. Robinson III and Robert R. Merhige, Jr., Federal Courthouse in Richmond, Virginia. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 10/25/2021. (tjoh, )
October 25, 2021 Filing 11 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Henry Brewster and Certification of Local Counsel Jeffrey Breit Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8067291. by Democratic Party of Virginia. (Breit, Jeffrey)
October 25, 2021 Filing 10 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Elisabeth Frost and Certification of Local Counsel Jeffrey Breit Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8067282. by Democratic Party of Virginia. (Breit, Jeffrey)
October 25, 2021 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge M. Hannah Lauck (Diane Daffron, OCR): Telephone Conference call held on October 25, 2021 regarding filing of complaint; Plaintiff updated Court on status of complaint; Defendants have not been served; however, they have a copy of the complaint; Plaintiff directed to file a TRO and Motion for Preliminary Injunction today (10/25/21); Defendant directed to respond by 4:00 p.m. on October 26, 2021; Status hearing to be held in-person on October 27, 2021 at 3:30 p.m.; Court directed named defendants to be present, in court, for status hearing. (mful)
October 25, 2021 Filing 8 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Democratic Party of Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of David R. Fox, #2 Exhibit Fox Decl. Ex. A, #3 Exhibit Fox Decl. Ex. B, #4 Exhibit Fox Decl. Ex. C, #5 Exhibit Fox Decl. Ex. D, #6 Exhibit Fox Decl. Ex. E, #7 Exhibit Fox Decl. Ex. F, #8 Proposed Order)(Breit, Jeffrey)
October 25, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to the Attorney General of the United States and the United States Attorney. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon the Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed as to USA, do not enter a service date. (sbea)
October 25, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint to the U.S. Attorney for the Eastern District of VA by Democratic Party of Virginia. (Breit, Jeffrey)
October 25, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint to Attorney General of the United States by Democratic Party of Virginia. (Breit, Jeffrey)
October 25, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Gerald Roane, Frank Veal, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (tjoh, )
October 25, 2021 Status Conference set for 10/27/2021 at 3:30 PM in Richmond Courtroom 6100 before District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (mful)
October 25, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (tjoh, )
October 22, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons to Gerald Roane in his official capacity by Democratic Party of Virginia. (Breit, Jeffrey)
October 22, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons to Frank Veal in his official capacity by Democratic Party of Virginia. (Breit, Jeffrey)
October 22, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8064597.), filed by Democratic Party of Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Breit, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Democratic Party of Virginia v. Veal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Democratic Party of Virginia
Represented By: Jeffrey Arnold Breit
Represented By: David Robert Fox
Represented By: Elisabeth Carmel Frost
Represented By: Henry Brewster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Veal
Represented By: Jonathan Tyler Lucier
Represented By: John Robinson
Represented By: Joseph Evan Borson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Roane
Represented By: Jonathan Tyler Lucier
Represented By: John Robinson
Represented By: Joseph Evan Borson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?