Conaway v. Close et al
Plaintiff: James R. Conaway
Defendant: Sallie M. Close and Ryan H. Houtsma
Case Number: 3:2021cv00725
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth W Hanes
Referring Judge: Robert E Payne
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2022 Filing 36 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Sallie M. Close. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ferrell, Edward)
January 14, 2022 Filing 35 Defendant Ryan H. Houtsma's ANSWER to Complaint by Ryan H. Houtsma.(Winneberger, Leslie)
January 12, 2022 Notice of Correction re #26 NOTICE, #34 NOTICE: The filing user has been notified that pursuant to Local Rule 26 discovery documents are not to be filed. (smej, )
January 11, 2022 Filing 34 NOTICE by James R. Conaway Plaintiff's Notice of Subpoenas Duces Tecum (Isaacs, Robert)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that, upon consent of the parties (ECF Nos. 24, 28, and 29), this action shall be REASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes for all purposes except settlement negotiations, which are hereby referred to Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell. It is further ORDERED that the Initial Pretrial Conference scheduled on the undersigned's docket for 11:20 a.m. January 19, 2022 is cancelled. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 1/11/2022. (Copy sent to Judge Hanes & Judge Colombell) (smej, )
January 11, 2022 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes and Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell. District Judge Robert E. Payne no longer assigned to the case. (smej, )
January 10, 2022 Filing 32 Memorandum in Support re #20 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Memorandum in Support of His Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by James R. Conaway. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint)(Isaacs, Robert)
January 10, 2022 Filing 31 Opposition to #20 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by James R. Conaway. (Isaacs, Robert)
January 10, 2022 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 Memorandum in Support, #2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by James R. Conaway. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Doc 1: Notice of Removal)(Isaacs, Robert)
January 10, 2022 Filing 29 Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Ryan H. Houtsma. (Winneberger, Leslie)
January 7, 2022 Filing 28 Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by James R. Conaway. (Isaacs, Robert)
January 7, 2022 Filing 27 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by James R. Conaway. (Isaacs, Robert)
January 6, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE by James R. Conaway Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum (Isaacs, Robert)
January 6, 2022 Filing 25 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 Memorandum in Support, #2 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Ryan H. Houtsma's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Late Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by Ryan H. Houtsma. (Jackson, Briana)
January 6, 2022 Filing 24 Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Sallie M. Close. (Ferrell, Edward)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that counsel shall confer with their respective clients and with each other to determine whether the parties will consent to assignment of the case to a Magistrate Judge as the presiding judicial officer. To that end, counsel for the plaintiff shall assure that the foregoing conferences occur not later than January 12, 2022, and that the Court is informed not later than 12:00 p.m. noon on January 13, 2022 whether such consents (by all parties) have been given; and, to avoid confusion, counsel for each party shall file, not later than 12:00 noon on January 13, 2022, a Statement Respecting Consent wherein the position of the party (whether consenting or not) shall be clearly set forth. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 1/6/2022. (smej, )
January 5, 2022 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint by Sallie M. Close.(Ferrell, Edward)
January 5, 2022 Filing 21 Memorandum in Support re #20 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , Brief in Support filed by Sallie M. Close. (Ferrell, Edward)
January 5, 2022 Filing 20 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Sallie M. Close. (Ferrell, Edward)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER - Having considered the PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE LATE RESPONSE TO MOTION TO SEVER (ECF No. 13), and finding good cause so to do, it is hereby ORDERED that the PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE LATE RESPONSE TO MOTION TO SEVER (ECF No. #13 ) is granted. It is further ORDERED that PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO SEVER BY DEFENDANT SALLY M. CLOSE (ECF No. #11 ) is considered timely filed. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 1/4/2022. (jpow, )
January 3, 2022 Filing 18 Memorandum in Support re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Opposition filed by James R. Conaway. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Doc 1 - Complaint)(Isaacs, Robert)
January 3, 2022 Filing 17 Opposition to #2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by James R. Conaway. (Isaacs, Robert)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER. See for complete details. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Nikki Brown with the permission of District Judge Robert E. Payne on 01/03/2022. (Attachment: #1 Schedule A)(nbrow)
January 3, 2022 Filing 15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 Memorandum in Support, #2 MOTION to Dismiss by James R. Conaway. (Isaacs, Robert)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2022 at 11:20 AM in Richmond Judges Chamber before District Judge Robert E. Payne. See for complete details. Issued at the direction of the Court. Signed by Nikki Brown with the permission of District Judge Robert E. Payne on 01/03/2022. (nbrow)
January 3, 2022 Filing 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 First MOTION to Sever , #7 Brief in Support, #12 Reply to Response to Motion, #11 Reply to Motion by James R. Conaway. (Isaacs, Robert)
December 30, 2021 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 First MOTION to Sever filed by Sallie M. Close. (Ferrell, Edward)
December 29, 2021 Filing 11 Reply to Motion re #6 First MOTION to Sever by Sallie Close filed by James R. Conaway. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Doc 1 - Complaint)(Isaacs, Robert)
December 17, 2021 Filing 9 Response to Plaintiff's re #4 Motion for Remand filed by Ryan H. Houtsma. (Jackson, Briana) (Main Document 9 replaced on 12/20/2021) (smej, ). Modified on 12/20/2021 (smej, ).
December 17, 2021 Filing 8 Response to Motion re #6 First MOTION to Sever Counts I and II of Plaintiff's Complaint Against Defendant Close and Remand to State Court filed by Ryan H. Houtsma. (Jackson, Briana) Modified docket text on 12/20/2021 (smej, ).
December 10, 2021 Filing 10 Objection to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by James R. Conaway. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint (State Court), #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Service (Close), #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Service (Houtsma), #4 Exhibit Demurrer of Houtsma (State Court)) (smej, )
December 10, 2021 Filing 7 Brief in Support to #6 First MOTION to Sever filed by Sallie M. Close. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ferrell, Edward)
December 10, 2021 Filing 6 First MOTION to Sever by Sallie M. Close. (Ferrell, Edward)
December 10, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward B Ferrell on behalf of Sallie M. Close (Ferrell, Edward)
December 10, 2021 Filing 4 Motion to Remand filed by James R. Conaway. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint (State Court), #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Service (Close), #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Service (Houtsma), #4 Exhibit Demurrer of Houtsma (State Court))(Isaacs, Robert) Modified to correct docket event on 12/13/2021 (jsmi, ). Modified to correct docket text on 12/20/2021 (smej, )
November 18, 2021 Filing 3 Memorandum in Support re #2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ryan H Houtsma. (Jackson, Briana)
November 18, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss by Ryan H Houtsma. (Jackson, Briana)
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8108196.), filed by Ryan H Houtsma. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Jackson, Briana)
November 18, 2021 Notice of Correction re #3 Memorandum in Support, #2 MOTION to Dismiss , #1 Notice of Removal: Clerk contacted the filing attorney and informed her of the errors in the pleadings filed. The filing attorney was instructed to add the civil action number to the Complaint, Motion to Dismiss, and the Memorandum in Support, and ensure that the signature line matches the filing users log in. The filing attorney is advised that the civil cover sheet is to be filed as an attachment. The filing attorney was instructed to email the corrected documents to the clerk. Once the documents are received, the clerk will replace them and regenerate the NEFs for the docket entries. Counsel for plaintiff are informed that their contact information does not match the contact information listed on the state court complaint. Effective Monday, April 19, 2021, with the upgrade to NextGen, attorneys are able to update their contact information via PACER. The instructions are found our website, www.vaed.uscourts.gov under the CM/ECF tab, followed by clicking on NextGen Information/Resources. (smej, )
November 18, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Robert E. Payne. (smej, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conaway v. Close et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R. Conaway
Represented By: Christopher Charles Leslie
Represented By: Robert Leighton Isaacs
Represented By: Christopher Leslie
Represented By: Robert L Isaacs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sallie M. Close
Represented By: Edward B Ferrell
Represented By: Henry Stokes Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan H. Houtsma
Represented By: Briana M. Jackson
Represented By: Leslie A. Winneberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?