Nardone v. National Strategic Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Vincent Nardone
Defendant: National Strategic Group, LLC and New Life Recovery Solutions
Case Number: 3:2021cv00731
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John A Gibney
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRETRIAL ORDER: Jury Trial set for 7/21/2022 at 09:00 AM in Richmond Courtroom 6000 before District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 1/10/22. (wtuc)
January 6, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr.:Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/6/2022. (wtuc)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/6/2022 at 09:10 AM before District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. Counsel shall report to courtroom 6000. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 11/30/21. (wtuc)
November 19, 2021 Notice of Correction re: #2 and #3 Financial Disclosure Statement; Documents were not properly saved. In the future, to correctly save a PDF fillable form, click on the File menu, select Print, and then select our PDF writer from the Printer Name List, then click on Print or OK depending on your program. Clerk has properly saved and placed the documents. No further action is required at this time. (sbea)
November 19, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. (tjoh, )
November 19, 2021 Filing 3 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by New Life Recovery Solutions. (Mejias, Alexander)
November 19, 2021 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by National Strategic Group, LLC. (Mejias, Alexander)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8113203.), filed by National Strategic Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Mejias, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nardone v. National Strategic Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Nardone
Represented By: Robert Francis Donnelly, Jr.
Represented By: Anthony NMN Tacconi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Strategic Group, LLC
Represented By: Alexander W Mejias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Life Recovery Solutions
Represented By: Alexander W Mejias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?