Chesapeake Bay Foundation Inc. et al v. County Of Henrico
Plaintiff: Chesapeake Bay Foundation Inc. and James River Association
Defendant: County Of Henrico
Case Number: 3:2021cv00752
Filed: December 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: David J Novak
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1319
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Reply to #16 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by County Of Henrico. (Pomeroy, Christopher)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION AND FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Chesapeake Bay Foundation Inc., James River Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A)(Mueller, Jon)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Jennifer Duggan to appear as Pro Hac Vice for James River Association. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 1/7/2022. (sbea)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Taylor Lilley to appear as Pro Hac Vice for Chesapeake Bay Foundation Inc. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 1/7/2022. (sbea)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Memorandum in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION AND FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by County Of Henrico. (Attachments: #1 Att.A - DEQ Enforcement Order, #2 Att.B - DEQ Enforcement Item Summary, #3 Att. C - Declaration of B. Chan)(Pomeroy, Christopher)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION AND FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by County Of Henrico. (Pomeroy, Christopher)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chesapeake Bay Foundation Inc. County Of Henrico served on 12/16/2021, answer due 1/6/2022 (Mueller, Jon)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jennifer Duggan and Certification of Local Counsel Jon Mueller Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8166485. by Chesapeake Bay Foundation Inc.. (Mueller, Jon)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Taylor Kaylia Lilley and Certification of Local Counsel Jon Mueller Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8166445. by Chesapeake Bay Foundation Inc.. (Mueller, Jon)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Issued as to County Of Henrico. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for the Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon the Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (sbea)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint,, by Chesapeake Bay Foundation Inc.. (Mueller, Jon)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re #4 , #5 , and #6 Proposed Summons. Filing attorney notified to file ONE proposed summons for the defendant as a non-fillable PDF. (jsmi, )
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint,, by Chesapeake Bay Foundation Inc.. (Mueller, Jon)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint,, by Chesapeake Bay Foundation Inc.. (Mueller, Jon)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint,, by Chesapeake Bay Foundation Inc.. (Mueller, Jon)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by James River Association. (Mueller, Jon)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Chesapeake Bay Foundation. (Mueller, Jon)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8136586.), filed by Chesapeake Bay Foundation, James River Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit Exhibit S)(Mueller, Jon) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/6/2021) (adun, ).
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Initial Case Assignment to District Judge David J. Novak. (adun, )
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re #1 Complaint; Clerk added Civil Action Number to the Complaint. No further action is required at this time. (adun, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chesapeake Bay Foundation Inc. et al v. County Of Henrico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chesapeake Bay Foundation Inc.
Represented By: Jon Mueller
Represented By: Taylor Lilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James River Association
Represented By: Jon Mueller
Represented By: Jennifer Duggan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County Of Henrico
Represented By: Christopher Donald Pomeroy
Represented By: Denise Mary Letendre
Represented By: Joseph Thomas Tokarz, II
Represented By: Justin W. Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?