UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al v. District Group Inc. et al
Plaintiff: A&A Contractors, LLC and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company and District Group Inc. doing business as District Contracting Group
Case Number: 3:2021cv00767
Filed: December 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: David J Novak
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40 U.S.C. ยง 3131
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER (Granting Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action) This matter comes before the Court on Defendants' Joint Consent Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Entirety of Action (ECF No. #11 ), moving to stay this action and compel arbitration pursuant to the Federal Arbitration Act, 9 U.S.C. 3. Having also received Plaintiffs' Notice of Consent to Stay (ECF No. #14 ), and for good cause shown, the Court hereby GRANTS Defendants' Motion. This action is STAYED pending arbitration proceedings that the Court expects the parties to completely resolve within 120 days of the entry of this Order. Further, the Court ORDERS that the parties provide the Court a status report within 120 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 1/25/2022. (asho, )
January 24, 2022 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 Consent MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action and Consent to Motion filed by A&A Contractors, LLC, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Furgurson, Ryan)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER (Requiring Notice of Consent or Opposition) re #11 Consent MOTION to Compel; The Court hereby ORDERS that Plaintiffs shall, within seven (7) days of the entry hereof, file notice of their consent to the Motion or intent to oppose it. Should Plaintiffs oppose the motion, they shall have fourteen (14) days from the filing of the Motion to do so. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 1/20/2022. (asho, )
January 19, 2022 Filing 12 Memorandum in Support re #11 Consent MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action filed by District Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Zisa, Michael)
January 19, 2022 Filing 11 Consent MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action by District Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zisa, Michael)
January 13, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by A&A Contractors, LLC Hartford Casualty Insurance Company served on 12/17/2021, answer due 1/21/2022 (Furgurson, Ryan)
January 13, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by A&A Contractors, LLC District Group Inc. served on 12/27/2021, answer due 1/21/2022 (Furgurson, Ryan)
January 7, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric George Korphage on behalf of Hartford Casualty Insurance Company (Korphage, Eric)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that the Court GRANTS Defendants' #6 Joint Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. Defendants shall file their responsive pleadings no later than January 21, 2022. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 1/7/2022. (jsmi, )
January 6, 2022 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by District Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zisa, Michael)
December 10, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to District Group Inc., Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (asho, ) (Main Document 5 replaced on 12/10/2021) (asho, ).
December 10, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge David J. Novak. (asho, )
December 9, 2021 Filing 4 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by A&A Contractors, LLC. (Furgurson, Ryan)
December 9, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint District Group Inc. by A&A Contractors, LLC. (Furgurson, Ryan)
December 9, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint Hartford Casualty Insurance Company by A&A Contractors, LLC. (Furgurson, Ryan)
December 9, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8145238.), filed by A&A Contractors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Furgurson, Ryan) (Main Document 1 replaced to include civil case number on 12/10/2021) (asho, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al v. District Group Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A&A Contractors, LLC
Represented By: Ryan Fitzgerald Furgurson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Eric George Korphage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Group Inc. doing business as District Contracting Group
Represented By: Michael Zisa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?