Hite v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Ella Thompson Hite
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Case Number: 3:2021cv00804
Filed: December 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Mark R Colombell
Referring Judge: David J Novak
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2022 Filing 11 Marshal's Return Executed as to Commissioner of SS, US Attorney General and US Attorney. (adun, )
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER FOR SOCIAL SECURITY CASES. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell on 7/1/2021. (adun, )
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER FOR SOCIAL SECURITY CASES. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell on 7/1/2021. (adun, )
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 6/30/2021. (adun, )
January 6, 2022 Filing 7 Certificate Reporting Service by SSA (Social Security Administration), Kilolo Kijakazi. SSA (Social Security Administration) served on 1/4/2021, answer due 3/5/2021; Kilolo Kijakazi served on 1/4/2021, answer due 3/5/2021. (Lucier, Jonathan)
January 6, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Tyler Lucier on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi, SSA (Social Security Administration) (Lucier, Jonathan)
December 29, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 USM285)(adun, )
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis #3 is GRANTED. Plaintiff may proceed in this case without paying the Courts filing fee. The Clerk is DIRECTED to issue process and deliver the summons to the United States Marshal for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell on 12/29/2021. (adun, )
December 29, 2021 Notice of Correction: Plaintiff's counsel is reminded that the Commissioner of Social Security, Kilolo Kijakazi, must be included in the Defendant's party name in ALL Social Security Cases. Per Order #4 the Clerk has substituted the Defendant. Please include the corrected Defendant's name on all filings moving forward. (adun, )
December 27, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ella Thompson Hite. (smej, )
December 27, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Ella Thompson Hite. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 USM-285 Form, #4 USM-285 Form, #5 USM-285 Form)(Goss, John)
December 27, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint , filed by Ella Thompson Hite. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 In Forma Pauperis)(Goss, John)
December 27, 2021 Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell. (smej, )
December 27, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge David J. Novak. (smej, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hite v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ella Thompson Hite
Represented By: John Osborne Goss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Jonathan Tyler Lucier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?