R.M.P. v. Mayorkas et al
Plaintiff: RMP and R.M.P.
Defendant: Secretary of DHS ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, Director, USCIS Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Deputy Director Larry Denayer, Associate Director Connie Nolan, Director, USCIS VSC Laura B. Zuchowski, Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Larry Denayer, Connie Nolan and Laura R. Zuchowski
Case Number: 3:2022cv00137
Filed: March 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2022 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Laura Zuchowski (asho, )
May 2, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by R.M.P. (Freedman, David)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER (Granting Plaintiff's Joint Motion to Stay) THIS MATTER is before the Court on Plaintiffs Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings, filed on April 8, 2022. ("Motion," ECF No. 19.) The parties jointly seek to stay the proceedings so that the United States Citizenship and Immigration Services ("USCIS") may take action on Plaintiffs U Visa petition. The parties agreed that if USCIS takes one of three actions as to Plaintiffs -'Form 1-918 Petition for U Visa" by June 16, 2022, Plaintiff will dismiss the complaint. Therefore, considering the agreed upon timeline in which USCIS must take action, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is STAYED until June 23, 2022. The parties are directed to contact the Court by June 20, 2022 to set up a conference call to discuss the status of the case. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 4/11/2022. (asho, )
April 8, 2022 Filing 19 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by R.M.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Freedman, David)
March 29, 2022 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney General (asho, )
March 25, 2022 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA (asho, )
March 22, 2022 Filing 16 Certificate Reporting Service by Connie Nolan, Alejandro Mayorkas, Larry Denayer, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Laura R. Zuchowski. Answer due 5/16/2022 (Lucier, Jonathan) Modified on 4/1/2022 (asho, ).
March 22, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Tyler Lucier on behalf of Larry Denayer, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Connie Nolan, Laura R. Zuchowski (Lucier, Jonathan)
March 17, 2022 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Laura R. Zuchowski, (Attachments: #1 USM-285 Form) Placed in USM box for service (asho, )
March 16, 2022 Filing 13 Proposed Summons to Laura Zuchowski by R.M.P.. (Freedman, David)
March 16, 2022 Filing 12 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Laura R. Zuchowski. (asho, )
March 14, 2022 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Larry Denayer, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Connie Nolan, Laura R. Zuchowski, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 USM-285 Forms) Clerk hand delivered to USMS. (asho, )
March 14, 2022 Filing 10 Proposed Summons to Merrick Garland by R.M.P.. (Freedman, David)
March 14, 2022 Filing 9 Proposed Summons to Jessica Aber by R.M.P.. (Freedman, David)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER (Granting Plaintiffs Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis) THIS MATTER is before the Court on Plaintiff RMP's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (ECF No. #2 ), filed on March 10, 2022. Upon due consideration, the Court concludes that Plaintiff is unable to pay the required fees. Therefore, Plaintiff's Motion is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiff may proceed in this case without paying the Court's filing fee. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file the Complaint and to issue process and deliver the summons to the United States Marshal for service. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 3/14/2022. (asho, )
March 14, 2022 Notice of Correction; Filing user notified to file proposed summonses for U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (asho, )
March 11, 2022 Notice of Correction; Filing user notified that Complaint has been docketed as RECEIVED only until the IFP motion is addressed. (asho, )
March 10, 2022 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (asho, )
March 10, 2022 Filing 7 Proposed Summons to Laura Zuchowski by R MP. (Freedman, David)
March 10, 2022 Filing 6 Proposed Summons to Connie Nolan by R MP. (Freedman, David)
March 10, 2022 Filing 5 Proposed Summons to Larry Denayer by R MP. (Freedman, David)
March 10, 2022 Filing 4 Proposed Summons to Ur Jaddou by R MP. (Freedman, David)
March 10, 2022 Filing 3 Proposed Summons to Alejandro Mayorkas by R MP. (Freedman, David)
March 10, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by R MP. (adun, )
March 10, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint (FILED) , filed by RMP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, (Freedman, David) Modified on 3/10/2022; (adun, ). (Main Document 1 replaced to include civil case number on 3/10/2022) (asho, ). (Attachment 1 replaced as a non-fillable PDF on 3/10/2022) (asho, ). Modified on 3/17/2022 (asho, ).
March 10, 2022 Notice of Correction; Filing user notified that the civil case number was omitted from the Complaint and to include on all future filings. Filing user notified that the Civil Cover Sheet was filed as a fillable form and to convert any future filings to a non-fillable PDF. Clerk has corrected these entries. (asho, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R.M.P. v. Mayorkas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RMP
Represented By: David John Freedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.M.P.
Represented By: David John Freedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of DHS ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, USCIS Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Director Larry Denayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associate Director Connie Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, USCIS VSC Laura B. Zuchowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Jonathan Tyler Lucier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Represented By: Jonathan Tyler Lucier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Denayer
Represented By: Jonathan Tyler Lucier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Nolan
Represented By: Jonathan Tyler Lucier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura R. Zuchowski
Represented By: Jonathan Tyler Lucier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?