Wade, et al v. Newport Group, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Derrell Wade, Reuben J. Boyd, Rev. Derrell Wade and Rev. Reuben J. Boyd, Jr.
Defendant: African Methodist Episcopal Church, James Davis, Samuel L Green, Estate of Bishop McKinley Young, Jerome V. Harris, Newport Group, Inc., Safeco Insurance Co. of America, Symetra Financial Corporation, American Express Co., RSM McGladrey, Rev. Dr. Jerome V. Harris, Bishop Samuel L. Green, Sr., Bishop James Davis, RSM US LLP, Doe Corporations 1-10 and John Does 1-10
Case Number: 3:2022cv00179
Filed: April 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: David J Novak
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2022 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Derrell Wade, Reuben J. Boyd, Jr. American Express Co. waiver sent on 4/12/2022, answer due 6/13/2022. (Langone, Joseph)
May 24, 2022 Filing 25 Summons Issued as to RSM US LLP. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (jpow, )
May 24, 2022 Notice of Correction re: ECF No. #24 , Proposed Summons, was an incorrectly saved in PDF fillable format which the Clerk has corrected and replaced. To correctly save the PDF fillable form, click on the File menu select Print, and then select your PDF writer from the Printer Name List, then click on Print or OK depending on your program. All PDFs that are filed must be in non-fillable form. No further action is required. (jpow, )
May 23, 2022 Filing 24 Proposed Summons re #23 Amended Complaint, for RSM US LLP by Reuben J. Boyd, Jr, Derrell Wade. (Langone, Joseph) (Main Document 24 replaced by Clerk in non-fillable format on 5/24/2022) (jpow, ).
May 23, 2022 Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT against African Methodist Episcopal Church, American Express Co., James Davis, Doe Corporations 1-10, Estate of Bishop McKinley Young, Samuel L. Green, Sr, Jerome V. Harris, John Does 1-10, Newport Group, Inc., Safeco Insurance Co. of America, Symetra Financial Corporation, RSM US LLP, filed by Derrell Wade, Reuben J. Boyd, Jr.(Langone, Joseph)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER (Granting Extension of Time) - The Court hereby GRANTS the Motion. #20 AME and Bishop Green shall have until June 27, 2022 to respond to the Complaint. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 5/16/2022. (jpow, )
May 13, 2022 Filing 21 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement by African Methodist Episcopal Church. (Zuk, Peter Nicholas) Modified docket text on 5/16/2022 (jpow, ).
May 13, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint , unopposed, by African Methodist Episcopal Church, Samuel L. Green, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zuk, Peter Nicholas)
May 5, 2022 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Newport Group, Inc.. (Riffee, Matthew)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER (Granting Extension of Time) - The Court hereby GRANTS the Motion. #17 Symetra shall have until June 27, 2022 to respond to the Complaint. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 4/29/2022. (jpow, )
April 28, 2022 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Symetra Financial Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rossi, Eugene)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER (Granting Extension of Time) - This matter comes before the Court on Defendant Newport Group, Inc. 's ("Newport") Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint (ECF No. #15 ), moving to extend the deadline for Newport to file a pleading in response to the Complaint until June 27, 2022, due to pending litigation in related cases regarding their consolidation for pretrial proceedings. Because Plaintiffs do not oppose the Motion, and for good cause shown, the Court hereby GRANTS the Motion. Newport shall have until June 27, 2022 to respond to the Complaint. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 4/26/2022. (jpow, )
April 22, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint) by Newport Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Riffee, Matthew)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Pro hac vice Retained DeMario Carswell for Newport Group, Inc. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 4/22/2022. (jpow, )
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Pro hac vice Retained James Fleckner for Newport Group, Inc. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 4/22/2022. (jpow, )
April 22, 2022 Filing 12 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Symetra Financial Corporation. (Rossi, Eugene) (Main Document 12 replaced on 4/28/2022) (jpow, ).
April 22, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Eugene Rossi on behalf of Symetra Financial Corporation (Rossi, Eugene) (Main Document 11 replaced on 4/28/2022) (jpow, ).
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Hearing Session Order. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell, Chair, PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, on 4/14/2022. (jpow, )
April 20, 2022 Notice of Correction re: ECF No. #6 Notice of Appearance, Counsel for defendant, Newport Group, Inc. is informed that their contact information is different from the court's database. Effective Monday, April 19, 2021, with the upgrade to NextGen, attorneys are able to update their contact information via PACER. The instructions are found on our website, www.vaed.uscourts.gov, under the CM/ECF tab, followed by clicking on NextGen Information/Resources. Furthermore, counsel is notified to ensure all electronic filings must contain the correct nine-element signature block. Please see Signatures: Nine Element Signature block in the E-Filing Policies and Procedures manual. Please include the nine-element signature block on all future filings. (jpow, )
April 19, 2022 Filing 9 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by DeMario Carswell and Certification of Local Counsel Matthew Riffee Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8352531. by Newport Group, Inc.. (Riffee, Matthew)
April 19, 2022 Filing 8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by James Fleckner and Certification of Local Counsel Matthew L. Riffee Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8352522. by Newport Group, Inc.. (Riffee, Matthew)
April 19, 2022 Filing 7 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Newport Group, Inc.. (Riffee, Matthew)
April 19, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Luke Riffee on behalf of Newport Group, Inc. (Riffee, Matthew)
April 7, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to African Methodist Episcopal Church and Estate of Bishop McKinley Young. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (jpow, )
April 6, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to American Express Co., James Davis, Samuel L. Green, Sr, Jerome V. Harris, Newport Group, Inc., RSM McGladrey, Safeco Insurance Co. of America, and Symetra Financial Corporation. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (jpow, )
April 6, 2022 Notice of Correction re: ECF No. #3 , Proposed Summonses; Filing attorney is notified to file proposed summonses for defendants, African Methodist Episcopal Church and the Estate of Bishop McKinley Young, to include the registered agent or a person who is authorized to accept service on their behalf. (jpow, )
April 5, 2022 Filing 3 Proposed Summons Revised by Reuben J. Boyd, Jr, Derrell Wade. (Wise, David) (Main Document 3 replaced on 4/7/2022) (jpow, ).
April 5, 2022 Notice of Correction re: ECF No. #2 Proposed Summonses; Proposed summonses attached in ECF No. 2 are only for one defendant. Filing attorney is notified to refile the proposed summonses to include a proposed summons for each of the defendants. (jpow, )
April 4, 2022 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge David J. Novak. (jpow, )
April 1, 2022 Filing 2 DISREGARD. Proposed Summons by Reuben J. Boyd, Derrell Wade. (Wise, David) Modified on 4/6/2022 (jpow, ).
April 1, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8325945.), filed by Derrell Wade, Reuben J. Boyd. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wise, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wade, et al v. Newport Group, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrell Wade
Represented By: David Hilton Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reuben J. Boyd
Represented By: David Hilton Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rev. Derrell Wade
Represented By: David Hilton Wise
Represented By: Joseph Michael Langone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rev. Reuben J. Boyd, Jr.
Represented By: David Hilton Wise
Represented By: Joseph Michael Langone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: African Methodist Episcopal Church
Represented By: Peter Nicholas Yaroslav Zuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel L Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Bishop McKinley Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome V. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newport Group, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Luke Riffee
Represented By: DeMario Carswell
Represented By: James Fleckner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Co. of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Symetra Financial Corporation
Represented By: Eugene Rossi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RSM McGladrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rev. Dr. Jerome V. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bishop Samuel L. Green, Sr.
Represented By: Peter Nicholas Yaroslav Zuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bishop James Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RSM US LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?