Ramey Kemp & Associates, Inc. v. Hultgren et al
Counter Defendant: Ramey Kemp & Associates, Inc.
Counter Claimant: Carl Hultgren, Michael Bailey and Gorove/Slade Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00283
Filed: April 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Annalese H. Reese for Michael Bailey, Gorove/Slade Associates, Inc., Carl Hultgren. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 6/15/2022. (adun, )
June 14, 2022 Filing 13 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Annalese H. Reese and Certification of Local Counsel Theresa M. Connolly Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8431003. by Michael Bailey, Gorove/Slade Associates, Inc., Carl Hultgren. (Connolly, Theresa)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Michael Elkon for Michael Bailey, Gorove/Slade Associates, Inc. and Carl Hultgren. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 6/14/2022. (adun, )
June 13, 2022 Filing 11 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael Elkon and Certification of Local Counsel Theresa M. Connolly Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8429304. by Michael Bailey, Gorove/Slade Associates, Inc., Carl Hultgren. (Connolly, Theresa)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER with Attachment #1 Pretrial Schedule A - Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/8/2022 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (Order issued by deputy clerk at the direction of the Court) (rpiz)
June 1, 2022 Notice of Correction re ECF #8 and #9 - Filing attorney reminded to use the nine element signature block format when filing documents. Please refer to Chapter 3 of the E-Filing Policies and Procedures Manual for proper format. Please use this format on all future filings. (adun, )
May 31, 2022 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gorove/Slade Associates, Inc., Michael Bailey, Carl Hultgren. (Connolly, Theresa)
May 31, 2022 Filing 8 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Ramey Kemp & Associates, Inc. by Gorove/Slade Associates, Inc., Michael Bailey, Carl Hultgren.(Connolly, Theresa)
May 23, 2022 Notice of Correction re #7 ; incorrect filing event used. Filing attorney will need to submit a "Waiver of Service" using the proper form found on the VAED.USCOURTS.GOV website under "civil forms". When submitting the waiver, please use the following event - Initial Pleadings and Service> Service of Process> Waiver of Service Executed. This event will generate an answer date (do not change this date) based on the date the waiver was sent. Also, please review the nine element signature block procedures that are found in the e-file policies and procedures manual, chapter 3. Please use the proper signature block on all future filings. (adun, )
May 20, 2022 Filing 7 STIPULATION Consent Stipulation by Michael Bailey, Gorove/Slade Associates, Inc., Carl Hultgren. (Connolly, Theresa)
April 20, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Michael Bailey, Gorove/Slade Associates, Inc., Carl Hultgren. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplex copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention. Electronically file the return using the filing events, "Summons Returned Executed" or "Summons Returned Unexecuted." (adun, )
April 20, 2022 Filing 5 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Ramey Kemp & Associates, Inc.. (Funk, Kevin)
April 20, 2022 Filing 4 Proposed Summons by Ramey Kemp & Associates, Inc.. (Funk, Kevin) (Main Document 4 replaced on 4/20/2022) (adun, ).
April 20, 2022 Filing 3 Proposed Summons by Ramey Kemp & Associates, Inc.. (Funk, Kevin) (Main Document 3 replaced on 4/20/2022) (adun, ).
April 20, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Ramey Kemp & Associates, Inc.. (Funk, Kevin) (Main Document 2 replaced on 4/20/2022) (adun, ).
April 20, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8353813.), filed by Ramey Kemp & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Funk, Kevin) (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/20/2022) (adun, ).
April 20, 2022 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (adun, )
April 20, 2022 Notice of Correction: Filing attorney reminded to add the civil action number to all documents prior to filing, and PDFs should not be filed as fill-able. Please convert to a regular PDF prior to uploading. The Clerk has added the civil action number and replaced the appropriate documents as standard PDFs. No further action is needed for these docket entries. Moving forward, please use the nine element signature block format when filing documents. Please refer to Chapter 3 of the E-Filing Policies and Procedures Manual for proper format. (adun, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramey Kemp & Associates, Inc. v. Hultgren et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Ramey Kemp & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Jermone Funk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Carl Hultgren
Represented By: Theresa Mannion Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Michael Bailey
Represented By: Theresa Mannion Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Gorove/Slade Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Theresa Mannion Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?