Booker v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Matthew E. Booker
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Case Number: 3:2022cv00285
Filed: April 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Mark R Colombell
Referring Judge: Robert E Payne
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Karl Emmett Osterhout to appear Pro hac vice for Matthew E. Booker. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 6/9/2022. (smej, )
June 7, 2022 Filing 11 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Karl E. Osterhout and Certification of Local Counsel Robert W. Gillikin, II Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8421452. by Matthew E. Booker. (Gillikin, Robert)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 7/1/2021. (smej, )
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell on 7/1/2021. (smej, )
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER STANDING ORDER IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell on 7/1/2021. (smej, )
May 4, 2022 Filing 7 Certificate Reporting Service by Kilolo Kijakazi. Kilolo Kijakazi served on 4/25/2022, answer due 6/24/2022. (Wu, Elizabeth)
May 4, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Catherine Wu on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Wu, Elizabeth)
April 21, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Clerk placed in USM box for service. (Attachments: #1 USM Forms) (smej, )
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - Upon due consideration, Plaintiffs Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. 2) filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a) is GRANTED. Plaintiff may proceed in this case without paying the Courts filing fee. The Clerk is DIRECTED to issue process and deliver the summons to the United States Marshal for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell on 4/21/2022. (smej, )
April 21, 2022 Filing 3 Proposed Summons All 3 Proposed Summonses with Form 285s by Matthew E. Booker. (Attachments: #1 Form 285s)(Gillikin, Robert)
April 21, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION In Forma Pauperis re #1 Complaint by Matthew E. Booker. (Gillikin, Robert)
April 21, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint , filed by Matthew E. Booker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gillikin, Robert) (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/21/2022) (smej, ).
April 21, 2022 Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell. (smej, )
April 21, 2022 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Robert E. Payne. (smej, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Booker v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew E. Booker
Represented By: Robert Wayne Gillikin, II
Represented By: Karl Emmett Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Elizabeth Catherine Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?