Immune Therapeutics, Inc. v. Handley
Plaintiff: Immune Therapeutics, Inc.
Defendant: Michael K. Handley
Case Number: 3:2022cv00412
Filed: June 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert E Payne
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDERED that: 1) The hearing scheduled for January 31, 2023, at 1:30 PM is canceled; and 2) Plaintiff's MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW (ECF No. #52 ) is denied as moot; and 3) Plaintiff's MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (ECF No. #57 ) is denied as moot. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Senior United States District Judge Robert E. Payne on 1/31/2023. (sbea)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Amended) by Immune Therapeutics, Inc.. (Stout, Kenneth)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 DISREGARD - See ECF No. #66 TIPULATION of Dismissal by Immune Therapeutics, Inc.(Stout, Kenneth). Modified on 1/31/2023. (sbea)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Set Hearing: Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 1/31/2023 at 01:30 PM in Richmond Courtroom 7400 before District Judge Robert E. Payne. (nbrow)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Reply to Motion re #57 MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss Action Without Prejudice filed by Immune Therapeutics, Inc.. (Stout, Kenneth)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDERED that 1) Plaintiff shall file a reply brief to DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (ECF No. #59 ) by January 17, 2023, because the MEMORANDUM IN RESPONSE TO ORDER (ECF No. #62 ) does not address the legal arguments raised by the Defendant in his response; and 2) A hearing on the Motion will be held on January 31, 2023, at 1:30 PM. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Senior United States District Judge Robert E. Payne on 1/4/2023. (sbea)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Memorandum in Response to #61 Order filed by Immune Therapeutics, Inc. (Stout, Kenneth). Modified on 12/15/2022. (sbea)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDERED that Plaintiff's MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT (ECF No. #60 ) is granted in part and denied in part. If the Plaintiff wishes to raise an objection under Federal Rule of Evidence 408, it must do so by filing a brief (with authorities) so that the issue can be addressed by both sides. Otherwise, the Court will consider the objection waived and will consider the documents in the decisional process. That brief shall be filed by December 23, 2022. The response and reply briefs shall be filed by January 6, 2023 and January 12, 2023, respectively. To the extent that the Motion (ECF No. #60 ) addresses the absence of cited authority in the response brief (the second paragraph of ECF No. #60 ), it is granted. See Order for details. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Senior United States District Judge Robert E. Payne on 12/14/2022. (sbea)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION for Leave to File Reply, with Memorandum in Support by Immune Therapeutics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Reply, #2 Proposed Order)(Stout, Kenneth)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 RESPONSE in Opposition re #57 MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss Action Without Prejudice filed by Michael K. Handley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Boyd, John)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Memorandum in Support re #57 MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss Action Without Prejudice filed by Immune Therapeutics, Inc.. (Stout, Kenneth)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss Action Without Prejudice by Immune Therapeutics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stout, Kenneth)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDERED that: 1) By 5:00 PM on December 7, 2022, Plaintiffs shall file either a Joint Stipulation of Dismissal or, in the event that an agreement with Defendant is not reached, a Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 4l(a)(2); and 2) If the Motion to Dismiss is filed, Defendant shall file a response by December 9, 2022. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Senior United States District Judge Robert E. Payne on 12/6/2022. (sbea)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 RESPONSE to Motion re #52 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff filed by Immune Therapeutics, Inc.. (Stout, Kenneth)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER that this matter is before the Court on the MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW (ECF No. #52 ) and supporting memorandum (ECF No. #53 ) filed by counsel for the plaintiff, Immune Therapeutics, Inc. It is hereby ORDERED that, by December 5, 2022, the plaintiff shall file a Statement of Position- either agreeing with the proposed withdrawal or opposing it and, if there is opposition, stating the reasons for the opposition. If there is opposition, counsel for the plaintiff shall a response thereto by December 12, 2022, and the plaintiff may file a reply by December 16, 2022. It is further ORDERED that, if there is no opposition to the Motion to Withdraw, plaintiff shall retain replacement counsel who shall note an appearance herein not later than December 30, 2022. Thereafter, the Court shall issue such orders as appropriate. Plaintiff is advised that if there is no opposition to the Motion to Withdraw, and if the plaintiff intends to retain replacement counsel, failure to do so by the specified date (December 30, 2022) will likely result in dismissal of the case. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Senior United States District Judge Robert E. Payne on 11/22/2022. (sbea)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Memorandum in Support re #52 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff filed by Immune Therapeutics, Inc.. (Stout, Kenneth)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff by Immune Therapeutics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stout, Kenneth)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER that the Initial Pretrial Conference scheduled for 11:00 a.m. November 16, 2022 is continued to 1:30 p.m. November 22, 2022. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 11/14/2022. (adun, )
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Reset Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/22/2022 at 01:30 PM in Richmond Judges Chamber before District Judge Robert E. Payne. (nbrow)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 SCHEDULING ORDER. See for complete details. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Nikki Brown with the permission of District Judge Robert E. Payne on 11/04/2022. (Attachment: #1 Schedule A) (nbrow)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/16/2022 at 11:00 AM in Richmond Judges Chamber before District Judge Robert E. Payne. See for complete details. Issued at the direction of the Court. Signed by Nikki Brown with the permission of District Judge Robert E. Payne on 11/04/2022. (nbrow)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (EOF No. 18) is granted in part and denied in part. The Motion is granted with respect to COUNT I, COUNT IV, and the 20(a) portion of COUNT II, and those Counts are dismissed with prejudice. The Motion is denied with respect to the 10(b) portion of COUNT II, COUNT III, and COUNT V. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 11/4/2022. (smej, )
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 11/4/2022. (smej, )
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Response to #42 Reply - Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Supplemental Brief filed by Immune Therapeutics, Inc.. (Stout, Kenneth)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Response Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law Regarding the Intracorporate Immunity Doctrine as Applied to Count IV filed by Michael K. Handley. (Boyd, John)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Memorandum (Supplemental) to #41 Order, filed by Immune Therapeutics, Inc.. (Stout, Kenneth)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Response Defendant's Supp. Brief Regarding the Intracorporate Immunity Doctrine filed by Michael K. Handley (Boyd, John) re: #41 Order. Modified on 10/11/2022. (sbea)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER that: 1) The Parties shall simultaneously submit a briefing on the above question by October 7, 2022; and 2) The Parties shall simultaneously provide a response by October 12, 2022. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Senior United States District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 9/29/2022. (sbea)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER that PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SEAL EXHIBIT TO OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B) (3) OR TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) AND/OR 28 U.S.C. 1406(A) (ECF No. #28 ) is granted and the exhibit (ECF No. #30 ) is filed under seal; provided that appropriately redacted versions thereof are filed in the publicrecord. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Senior United States District Judge Robert E. Payne on 9/28/2022. (sbea)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER that that the DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO FED R. CIV.P.12 (b)(2) (ECF No. #11 ) is DENIED because: 1) the premise of the jurisdictional motion is that Count II(which is based on 15 U.S.C. 78a et seq.) fails to state a claim on which relief can be granted which is an inappropriate premise for a motion asserting the absence of in personam jurisdiction; and 2) the Court has personal jurisdiction over Defendant through 27 of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, codified at 15 U.S.C. 78aa(a), because Defendant has sufficient contacts with the United States so that personal jurisdiction complies with the Due Process Clause of the Fifth Amendment. It is further ORDERED that the facts and legal contentions are adequately presented in the materials before the Court andoral argument would not aid the decisional process. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Senior United States District Judge Robert E. Payne on 9/27/2022. (sbea)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER that the DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR IMPROPER VENUE PURSUANT TO FED R. CIV. P. 12(b) (3) OR TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) AND/OR 28 U.S.C. 1406(a) (ECF Nos. #13 and #15 ) is DENIED because: 1) venue is proper in the Eastern District of Virginia Richmond Division under 27 of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, codified at 15 U.S.C. 78aa(a), because, viewing the facts in the light most favorable to the Plaintiff, Aggarao v. MOL Ship Mgmt. Co., Ltd., 675 F.3d 355, 365-66 (4th Cir. 2012), Defendant repeated material misrepresentations to investors in the judicial district where the Court sits that constitute the securities act violation. It is further ORDERED that the facts and legal contentions are adequately presented in the materials before the Court and oral argument would not aid the decisional process. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Senior United States District Judge Robert E. Payne on 9/27/2022. (sbea)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Request for Hearing by Michael K. Handley re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, #15 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue pursuant to 28 USC 1404 (a) and/or 28 USC 1406(a) (Boyd, John)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Reply to #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #19 Memorandum in Support, Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Michael K. Handley. (Boyd, John)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Reply to #16 Memorandum in Support, #15 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue pursuant to 28 USC 1404 (a) and/or 28 USC 1406(a) Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 USC 1404(a) and/or 28 USC 1406(a) filed by Michael K. Handley. (Boyd, John)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Reply to #14 Memorandum in Support, #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Improper Venue Pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 12(b)(3) filed by Michael K. Handley. (Boyd, John)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Reply to #12 Memorandum in Support, #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Michael K. Handley. (Boyd, John)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re: #30 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s), #26 Opposition, #29 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C), #27 Opposition, #31 Memorandum in Support, #32 Opposition, #28 MOTION to Seal Exhibit; the signature does not match the filing user's login for these documents. Please contact the Clerk's Office so that documents can be replaced rather than re-filing. (sbea)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Opposition to #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Immune Therapeutics, Inc. (Stout, Kenneth). Clerk replaced document on 8/29/2022. Modified on 8/29/2022. (sbea)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Memorandum in Support re: #28 MOTION to Seal Exhibit filed by Immune Therapeutics, Inc. (Stout, Kenneth). Clerk replaced document on 8/29/2022. Modified on 8/29/2022. (sbea)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) re #28 MOTION to Seal Exhibit. (Stout, Kenneth)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Immune Therapeutics, Inc. re: #28 MOTION to Seal Exhibit (Stout, Kenneth). Clerk replaced document on 8/29/2022. Modified on 8/29/2022. (sbea)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION to Seal Exhibit by Immune Therapeutics, Inc. (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Stout, Kenneth). Clerk replaced on 8/29/2022. Modified on 8/29/2022. (sbea)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Opposition to #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, #15 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue pursuant to 28 USC 1404 (a) and/or 28 USC 1406(a) filed by Immune Therapeutics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Decl. of N. Griffin - Redacted)(Stout, Kenneth). Clerk replaced document on 8/29/2022. Modified on 8/29/2022. (sbea)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Opposition to #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Immune Therapeutics, Inc. (Stout, Kenneth). Clerk replaced document on 8/29/2022. Modified on 8/29/2022. (sbea)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph M. Rainsbury on behalf of Immune Therapeutics, Inc. (Rainsbury, Joseph)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER that #23 CONSENT MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINES UNDER LOCAL RULES 7(E) AND (F) is granted. See Order for details and deadlines. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 8/18/2022. (jsmi, )
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Consent MOTION for Extension of Deadlines Under Local Rules 7(E) and (F) by Michael K. Handley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Boyd, John)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER that the #21 CONSENT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR IMMUNE THERAPEUTICS, INC. TO FILE BRIEFS IN OPPOSITION is granted. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiff shall file, by August 26, 2022, its responses to the following motions: 1) DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b) (2)(ECF No. #11 ); and 2) DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR IMPROPER VENUE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b) (3) OR TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) AND/OR 28 U.S.C. 1406(a) (ECF Nos. #13 and #15 ); and 3) DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (ECF No. #18 ). It is so ORDERED. Signed by Senior United States District Judge Robert E. Payne on 7/26/2022. (sbea)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, #15 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue pursuant to 28 USC 1404 (a) and/or 28 USC 1406(a) by Immune Therapeutics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stout, Kenneth)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Michael K. Handley.(Boyd, John)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Memorandum in Support re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Michael K. Handley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Boyd, John)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Michael K. Handley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Boyd, John)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael K. Handley re #14 Memorandum in Support, #16 Memorandum in Support, #12 Memorandum in Support, #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, #15 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue pursuant to 28 USC 1404 (a) and/or 28 USC 1406(a) (Boyd, John)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Memorandum in Support re #15 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue pursuant to 28 USC 1404 (a) and/or 28 USC 1406(a) filed by Michael K. Handley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(Boyd, John)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue pursuant to 28 USC 1404 (a) and/or 28 USC 1406(a) by Michael K. Handley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Boyd, John)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Memorandum in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by Michael K. Handley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(Boyd, John)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue by Michael K. Handley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Boyd, John)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Memorandum in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Michael K. Handley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(Boyd, John)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Michael K. Handley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Boyd, John)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for John Powell to appear as Pro Hac Vice for Michael K. Handley. Signed by Senior United States District Judge Robert E. Payne on 7/22/2022. (sbea)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Joseph Eric Samuel to appear as Pro Hac Vice for Michael K. Handley. Signed by Senior United States District Judge Robert E. Payne on 7/22/2022. (sbea)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by John Powell and Certification of Local Counsel J.P. McGuire Boyd, Jr. Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8484564. by Michael K. Handley. (Boyd, John)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph Eric Samuel, Jr. and Certification of Local Counsel J.P. McGuire Boyd, Jr. Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8483711. by Michael K. Handley. (Boyd, John)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Returned Executed served on Michael K. Hundley c/o Mrs. Hundley on 06/17/2022, filed by Immune Therapeutics, Inc. (Wolf, Thomas). Modified on 7/12/2022. (sbea)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re: #6 Affidavit of Service; Clerk corrected the docket text to reflect the correct filing event. However, since an Order was granted for an Extension to respond to the complaint, the due date generated by this event is moot. (sbea)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that the Motion (ECF No. #4 ) is granted with modification. It is further ORDERED that the defendant, Michael K. Handley, shall file its Answer and any other motions with respect to the Complaint by July 22, 2022. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Senior United States District Judge Robert E. Payne on 7/6/2022. (sbea)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Michael K. Handley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Boyd, John)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Immune Therapeutics, Inc., NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for the Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon the Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (sbea)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Immune Therapeutics, Inc.. (Stout, Kenneth)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Robert E. Payne. (sbea)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint (Filing Fee: $402, Receipt Number: AVAEDC-8414203), filed by Immune Therapeutics, Inc. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wolf, Thomas). Modified on 6/2/2022. (sbea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Immune Therapeutics, Inc. v. Handley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Immune Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Marshall Wolf
Represented By: Kenneth Thomas Stout
Represented By: Joseph M. Rainsbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael K. Handley
Represented By: John Peyton McGuire Boyd, Jr.
Represented By: John Powell
Represented By: Joseph Eric Samuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?