Webb v. Office of Management & Budget (OMB) et al
Plaintiff: Major Mike Webb doing business as Friends for Mike Webb (C00591537) also known as Major Mike Webb for Congress (H8VA08167) doing business as Major Mike Webb for APS Board and Major Mike Webb for Congress (H
Defendant: META Platforms, Inc., Office of Management & Budget (OMB) and Facebook, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00418
Filed: June 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: David J Novak
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2022 USCA Case Number 22-1698, Case Manager J. Neal, for #3 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Major Mike Webb. (smej, )
June 28, 2022 Filing 4 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #3 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (smej, )
June 28, 2022 Assembled INITIAL Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA re #3 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal (smej, )
June 27, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL From Order to Amend and Denying Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Major Mike Webb. (jpow, )
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER (Denying Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Ordering Particularized Complaint) The Court finds that Plaintiff is not qualified to proceed in forma pauper is and, therefore, the Court hereby DENIES the Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (ECF no. #1 ). The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to pay the required filing fee by June 27, 2022. The Court has reviewed the Complaint and finds that it does not satisfy Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 8. It is hereby ORDERED that, within twenty-one (21) days of this Order, Plaintiff shall file a particularized amended complaint that outlines in simple and straightforward terms why Plaintiff thinks that he is entitled to relief and why the Court has jurisdiction over this case, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 8(a)(l) and (2). Once filed, the particularized amended complaint will become the operative complaint in this case. The failure to strictly comply with the Court's directive and with applicable rules will result in DISMISSAL of this action for failure to prosecute under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (b ). SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS AND DEADLINES. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 6/6/2022. A copy of this Order sent electronically to all counsel of record and a copy sent to Plaintiff at his address of record as directed. (asho, )
June 3, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Major Mike Webb. (Attachments: #1 Complaint (RECEIVED), #2 Complaint - Substitution (RECEIVED), #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 83.1(M) Certification, #5 Praecipe - summons, #6 Envelope)(asho, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webb v. Office of Management & Budget (OMB) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Major Mike Webb doing business as Friends for Mike Webb (C00591537) also known as Major Mike Webb for Congress (H8VA08167) doing business as Major Mike Webb for APS Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Major Mike Webb for Congress (H
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: META Platforms, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Management & Budget (OMB)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?